Wilhelm v. Hudgins

Petitioner: Kenneth Wilhelm
Respondent: Richard Hudgins
Case Number: 1:2019cv00551
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL on 3/14/2019. (sphil, )
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 #1 and this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE because Mr. Wilhelm has failed to exhaust administrative remedies and because the due process claim lacks merit. IFP on appeal is denied, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/14/2019. (sphil, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number cox089246. (sphil, )
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies. If Applicant fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/25/2019. (sphil, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Kenneth Wilhelm.(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilhelm v. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Wilhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?