Poston v. UQM Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Blake Poston
Defendant: John E. Sztykiel, Joseph R. Mitchell, Stephen J. Roy, Joseph P. Sellinger, UQM Technologies, Inc. and Donald W. Vanlandingham
Case Number: 1:2019cv00648
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Continue. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 7/6/2019, and the Scheduling Conference set for 5/6/2019 is VACATED and RESET for 7/5/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, with the proposed Scheduling Order due by 6/28/2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/30/2019. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM regarding #22 Joint MOTION to Continue Existing Deadlines filed by Joseph R. Mitchell, Donald W. Vanlandingham, UQM Technologies, Inc., John E. Sztykiel, Joseph P. Sellinger, Stephen J. Roy. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/30/2019. (wjmsec, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Continue Existing Deadlines by Defendants Joseph R. Mitchell, Stephen J. Roy, Joseph P. Sellinger, John E. Sztykiel, UQM Technologies, Inc., Donald W. Vanlandingham. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Wagner, Thomas)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2018 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/ 24/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/24/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 19 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #18 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00648-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Blake Poston All parties do not consent.. (Acocelli, Richard)
March 11, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Blake Poston. John E. Sztykiel waiver sent on 3/8/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Acocelli, Richard)
March 11, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Blake Poston. Joseph P. Sellinger waiver sent on 3/8/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Acocelli, Richard)
March 11, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Blake Poston. Stephen J. Roy waiver sent on 3/8/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Acocelli, Richard)
March 11, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Blake Poston. Joseph R. Mitchell waiver sent on 3/8/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Acocelli, Richard)
March 11, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Blake Poston. Donald W. Vanlandingham waiver sent on 3/8/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Acocelli, Richard)
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Blake Poston. UQM Technologies, Inc. waiver sent on 3/8/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Acocelli, Richard)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/8/2019. A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/6/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed order in Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 4/29/2019. The parties shall complete and file the Consent/Nonconsent Form by 4/22/2019. (bwilk, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser added to party Joseph R. Mitchell (pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser added to party Stephen J. Roy(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser added to party Joseph P. Sellinger(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser added to party John E. Sztykiel (pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser added to party UQM Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser added to party Donald W. Vanlandingham(pty:dft) (Reeser, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Isuri Marianne Lawson on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Isuri Marianne Lawson added to party Joseph R. Mitchell (pty:dft), Attorney Isuri Marianne Lawson added to party Stephen J. Roy(pty:dft), Attorney Isuri Marianne Lawson added to party Joseph P. Sellinger(pty:dft), Attorney Isuri Marianne Lawson added to party John E. Sztykiel (pty:dft), Attorney Isuri Marianne Lawson added to party UQM Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Isuri Marianne Lawson added to party Donald W. Vanlandingham(pty:dft) (Lawson, Isuri)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bryan Michael Westhoff on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Bryan Michael Westhoff added to party Joseph R. Mitchell (pty:dft), Attorney Bryan Michael Westhoff added to party Stephen J. Roy(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan Michael Westhoff added to party Joseph P. Sellinger(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan Michael Westhoff added to party John E. Sztykiel (pty:dft), Attorney Bryan Michael Westhoff added to party UQM Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan Michael Westhoff added to party Donald W. Vanlandingham(pty:dft) (Westhoff, Bryan)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Wagner, Thomas)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Thomas Hardy Wagner on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Franchi Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Arukala Complaint)(Wagner, Thomas)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas Hardy Wagner on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Thomas Hardy Wagner added to party Joseph R. Mitchell (pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Hardy Wagner added to party Stephen J. Roy(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Hardy Wagner added to party Joseph P. Sellinger(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Hardy Wagner added to party John E. Sztykiel (pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Hardy Wagner added to party UQM Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Hardy Wagner added to party Donald W. Vanlandingham(pty:dft) (Wagner, Thomas)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (rvill, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Richard Adam Acocelli on behalf of Blake Poston (Acocelli, Richard)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joseph R. Mitchell, Stephen J. Roy, Joseph P. Sellinger, John E. Sztykiel, UQM Technologies, Inc., Donald W. Vanlandingham (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6565877)Attorney Richard Adam Acocelli added to party Blake Poston (pty:pla), filed by Blake Poston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Plaintiff Certification)(Acocelli, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poston v. UQM Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Sztykiel
Represented By: Bryan Michael Westhoff
Represented By: Thomas Hardy Wagner
Represented By: Isuri Marianne Lawson
Represented By: Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Mitchell
Represented By: Bryan Michael Westhoff
Represented By: Thomas Hardy Wagner
Represented By: Isuri Marianne Lawson
Represented By: Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen J. Roy
Represented By: Bryan Michael Westhoff
Represented By: Thomas Hardy Wagner
Represented By: Isuri Marianne Lawson
Represented By: Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P. Sellinger
Represented By: Bryan Michael Westhoff
Represented By: Thomas Hardy Wagner
Represented By: Isuri Marianne Lawson
Represented By: Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UQM Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Michael Westhoff
Represented By: Thomas Hardy Wagner
Represented By: Isuri Marianne Lawson
Represented By: Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald W. Vanlandingham
Represented By: Bryan Michael Westhoff
Represented By: Thomas Hardy Wagner
Represented By: Isuri Marianne Lawson
Represented By: Jeffrey Kenneth Reeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Poston
Represented By: Richard Adam Acocelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?