Chavez v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Plaintiff: Beatriz Chavez
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service, State of Colorado Department of Revenue, MARIA DE LOURDES HERRERA CARDOZA, Treasurer Steve Ellington, GVR METROPOLITAN DISTRICT, CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.,, Steve Ellington, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. and David Kautter
Case Number: 1:2019cv00660
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: John L Kane
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service of Certified ORDER of REMAND, docket sheet and file to Sabra A. Millett, Clerk, 2nd Judicial District, Denver District Court, 1437 Bannock Street, Room 256, Denver, CO 80202. (babia)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Motion to Remand to State Court by Judge John L. Kane on 4/3/19. (babia) (Main Document 12 replaced on 4/3/2019 with certified stamped order) (babia).
April 3, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Beatriz Chavez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Miller, Lindsay)
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST by Defendant David Kautter. (Garcia, J.)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #8 Notice (Other) by Defendant David Kautter. (Garcia, J.)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE State Docket Sheet by Defendant David Kautter (Garcia, J.)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The IRS shall have until May 6, 2019, to answer or otherwise plead. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 3/7/2019. (cthom, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge John L. Kane and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT to Quiet Title against Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Steve Ellington, GVR Metropolitan District, Maria De Lourdes Herrera Cardoza, David Kautter, State of Colorado Department of Revenue, filed by Beatriz Chavez.(cmadr, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Garcia, J.)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Internal Revenue Service from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2019CV030411., filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Garcia, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavez v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Colorado Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA DE LOURDES HERRERA CARDOZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasurer Steve Ellington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GVR METROPOLITAN DISTRICT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Ellington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kautter
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatriz Chavez
Represented By: Lindsay Johnson Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?