G.H. Daniels III & Associates, Inc. et al v Acosta et al

Plaintiff: Berich Masonry, Inc., Mountain Division, Rocky Valley Contractors, LLC, Landscape Technology Group, Inc., G.H. Daniels III & Associates, Inc. and Berich Masonry, Mountain Division, Inc.
Defendant: Mike Pompeo, Alexander Acosta and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 1:2019cv00667
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1151
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 36 Corrected TRANSCRIPT to correct case number only of Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order held on March 19, 2019 before Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Pages: 1-71.
< NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov.

< Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (jcopp, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 35 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order held on March 19, 2019 before Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Pages: 1-71.
< NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov.

< Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (jcopp, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 34 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE pursuant to #33 MINUTE ORDER, this action is directly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00667-PAB-GPG. (Text Only Entry). (sphil, )
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/19/2019. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 19-cv-00667-PAB-GPG. (sphil, )
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/19/2019, re: #4 Motion for Leave to Restrict is DENIED. ORDERED that Docket Nos. 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 8, 10, 13, 16, 20, 22, 23, 24, 26, 27, 28, and 29 shall be unrestricted. (sphil, )
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/18/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
April 17, 2019 Filing 30 COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 4/17/2019 before Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #2 is DENIED as to the preliminary injunction. Court Reporter: Janet Coppock. (sgrim)
April 17, 2019 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Chris Pooley, Esq. by Plaintiffs Berich Masonry, Mountain Division, Inc., G.H. Daniels III & Associates, Inc., Landscape Technology Group, Inc., Rocky Valley Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A emails, #2 Exhibit B requests and draft motion)(Pooley, Christopher)
April 12, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE Regarding Witness And Exhibit Lists For The Hearing Scheduled On April 19, 2019 by Defendants Alexander Acosta, Kirstjen Nielsen, Mike Pompeo (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
April 12, 2019 Filing 27 Witness List by Plaintiffs Berich Masonry, Mountain Division, Inc., G.H. Daniels III & Associates, Inc., Landscape Technology Group, Inc., Rocky Valley Contractors, LLC. (Pooley, Christopher)
April 12, 2019 Filing 26 Exhibit List by Plaintiffs Berich Masonry, Mountain Division, Inc., G.H. Daniels III & Associates, Inc., Landscape Technology Group, Inc., Rocky Valley Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Pooley, Christopher)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to file any witness or exhibit lists no later than 5:00 p.m. today. If either plaintiffs or defendants do not intend to call witnesses or use exhibits at the April 17, 2019 hearing, they should indicate that fact. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/12/19. (pabsec)
April 10, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Elizabeth D. Kurlan added to party Alexander Acosta(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth D. Kurlan added to party Kirstjen Nielsen(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth D. Kurlan added to party Mike Pompeo(pty:dft) (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
April 8, 2019 Filing 23 SURREPLY re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendants Alexander Acosta, Kirstjen Nielsen, Mike Pompeo. (Girdharry, Glenn)
April 1, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Berich Masonry, Inc., Mountain Division, G.H. Daniels III & Associates, Inc., Landscape Technology Group, Inc., Rocky Valley Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Pooley, Christopher). Modified on 4/2/2019 to correct linkage.(sphil, ).
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs may have until April 1, 2019 to file their reply brief regarding the motion for preliminary injunction #2 ; defendants' sur-reply will be due April 8, 2019. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/29/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
March 28, 2019 Filing 20 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #16 Response to Motion, by Plaintiffs Berich Masonry, Mountain Division, Inc., G.H. Daniels III & Associates, Inc., Landscape Technology Group, Inc., Rocky Valley Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Pooley, Christopher)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the hearing set for April 17, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. is RESET for 2:30 p.m. the same day in Courtroom A 701 before Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/26/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER. A hearing on the portion of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #2 which requests a preliminary injunction is set for two hours on April 17, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom A 701 before Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. The briefing schedule is set forth in the minutes of the March 19, 2019 hearing #17 . The parties shall file their exhibit lists and witness lists via CM-ECF on or before April 10, 2019, using the forms available on the District Court website at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/Judges/Judges.aspx. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/19/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
March 19, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held before Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/19/2019. Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. Court Reporter: Janet Coppock. (pglov) (Main Document 17 replaced on 3/19/2019) (pglov, ).
March 13, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order in Opposition, filed by Defendants Alexander Acosta, Kirstjen Nielsen, Mike Pompeo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Pasternak Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Ahluwalia Declaration)(Girdharry, Glenn) Modified on 4/10/2019 to correct linkage. (sphil, ).
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER. The hearing set for March 14, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. is RESET for March 19, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom A 701 before Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. The hearing is set for two hours, which will include time for the ruling. Evidence will proceed by way of offers of proof, with no live witnesses. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/13/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER. In light of the weather in Denver and the difficulties of travel, the attorneys should call Chambers (303-335-2794) on a conference call as soon as possible to discuss whether the hearing set for Thursday March 14 should be rescheduled. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/13/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Glenn Matthew Girdharry on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Glenn Matthew Girdharry added to party Alexander Acosta(pty:dft), Attorney Glenn Matthew Girdharry added to party Kirstjen Nielsen(pty:dft), Attorney Glenn Matthew Girdharry added to party Mike Pompeo(pty:dft) (Girdharry, Glenn)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER re hearing set for March 14, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. The hearing is set for two hours, which will include time for the ruling. Evidence will proceed by way of offers of proof, with no live witnesses. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/12/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER. A hearing on the portion of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #2 which requests a temporary restraining order is set for March 14, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom A 701 before Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Defendants shall file a response to the motion no later than noon on March 13, 2019. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/11/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00667-PAB. (athom, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Rocky Valley Contractors, LLC, G.H. Daniels III & Associates, Inc., Berich Masonry, Inc., Mountain Division, Landscape Technology Group, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6571097), filed by Rocky Valley Contractors, LLC, G.H. Daniels III & Associates, Inc., Berich Masonry, Inc., Mountain Division, Landscape Technology Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Pooley, Christopher)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document, #3 Continuation of Main Document)(Pooley, Christopher)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiffs Berich Masonry, Inc., Mountain Division, G.H. Daniels III & Associates, Inc., Landscape Technology Group, Inc., Rocky Valley Contractors, LLC. (Pooley, Christopher)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support of #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Berich Masonry, Inc., Mountain Division, G.H. Daniels III & Associates, Inc., Landscape Technology Group, Inc., Rocky Valley Contractors, LLC. (Pooley, Christopher) Modified on 3/8/2019 to correct event text (athom, ).
March 7, 2019 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Berich Masonry, Inc., Mountain Division, G.H. Daniels III & Associates, Inc., Landscape Technology Group, Inc., Rocky Valley Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Continuation of Main Document, #14 Proposed Document)(Pooley, Christopher) Modified on 3/8/2019 to add text (athom, ).
March 7, 2019 Filing 1 Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G.H. Daniels III & Associates, Inc. et al v Acosta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berich Masonry, Inc., Mountain Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Valley Contractors, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Jonathan Pooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landscape Technology Group, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Jonathan Pooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.H. Daniels III & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Jonathan Pooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berich Masonry, Mountain Division, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Jonathan Pooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pompeo
Represented By: Elizabeth D. Kurlan
Represented By: Glenn Matthew Girdharry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Acosta
Represented By: Elizabeth D. Kurlan
Represented By: Glenn Matthew Girdharry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Elizabeth D. Kurlan
Represented By: Glenn Matthew Girdharry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?