Wood v. Lockheed Martin Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Douglas Wood
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Savings Plan Administrative Committee, Claims Administrators of the Lockheed Martin Executive Severance Plan, Lockheed Martin Management Development and Compensation Committee of the Company's Board of Directors, Change Name for Claims Administrators of the Lockheed Martin Executive Severance Plan, The and Lockheed Martin Corporation a Maryland Corporation authorized to do business in the State of Colorado, doing business as Lockheed Martin Aeronautics doing business as Lockheed Martin Mission Systems and Training doing business as SIM Industries BV do
Case Number: 1:2019cv00795
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Daniel D Domenico
2 Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING #36 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Word Limitations. Plaintiff seeks leave to exceed the Court's 4,000-word limit in response to Defendants' motion to dismiss. See DDD Civ. P.S. III(A)(1). The Court is unconvinced that ~6,900 words are necessary to respond to a ~4,200-word motion. Nonetheless, the Court understands that its Practice Standards were published only today, while Plaintiff was in the midst of electronically filing his response brief. As such, Plaintiff's motion for leave to exceed is GRANTED. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 7/1/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 20) by Plaintiff Jeffrey Douglas Wood. (Davidovich, Nathan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Douglas Wood. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eileen R. Lerman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Davidovich, Nathan)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 6/25/2019. (slibi, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 33 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/25/2019. Discovery due by 4/21/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/29/2020. Joint Status Report due by 1/9/2020. FTR: Courtroom C205. (slibi, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants shall file any reply in support of #20 Motion to Dismiss no later than 7/29/2019. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 6/25/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Change Name for Claims Administrators of the Lockheed Martin Executive Severance Plan, The, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Management Development and Compensation Committee of the Company's Board of Directors, Lockheed Martin Savings Plan Administrative Committee. (Glenn, Abbey)
June 11, 2019 Filing 30 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants Change Name for Claims Administrators of the Lockheed Martin Executive Severance Plan, The, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Management Development and Compensation Committee of the Company's Board of Directors, Lockheed Martin Savings Plan Administrative Committee. (Glenn, Abbey)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER granting #27 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Appear at Scheduling Conference by Telephone, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 6/06/2019.(slibi, )
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #27 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear by telephone at Scheduling Conference of June 25 2019 filed by Jeffrey Douglas Wood. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 6/6/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear by telephone at Scheduling Conference of June 25 2019 by Plaintiff Jeffrey Douglas Wood. (Davidovich, Nathan)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 6/05/2019. The proposed Scheduling Order shall be filed on or before June 18, 2019. (slibi, )
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 6/4/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER re: 19 Minute Order. The Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2019 at 10:30 am is VACATED. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 6/4/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 This action is reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico, upon his appointment. Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Judge Domenico in Courtroom A-702. His chambers are located in A-738 of the Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse. His telephone number is 303-335-2468. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00795-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. The response is now due by 7/1/19. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/28/19. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
May 27, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Plaintiff Jeffrey Douglas Wood. (Davidovich, Nathan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Change Name for Claims Administrators of the Lockheed Martin Executive Severance Plan, The, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Management Development and Compensation Committee of the Company's Board of Directors, Lockheed Martin Savings Plan Administrative Committee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abbey M. Glenn in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Blumenfeld, Jeremy)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. The Court requests that counsel coordinate a conference call and then contact Chambers at (303) 844-4694. The proposed scheduling order should be tendered to the Court at least five days prior to the conference. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/16/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #17 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/13/19. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
May 10, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendants Change Name for Claims Administrators of the Lockheed Martin Executive Severance Plan, The, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Management Development and Compensation Committee of the Company's Board of Directors, Lockheed Martin Savings Plan Administrative Committee. (Glenn, Abbey)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. In light of the decline of consent to a magistrate judge by one or more of the parties in this case and its reassignment to this Court, the Scheduling Conference set June 6, 2019 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter is VACATED. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date within 14 days of the date of this order. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/8/19. (rbjsec. )
May 6, 2019 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED. pursuant to #14 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00795-NRN. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Change Name for Claims Administrators of the Lockheed Martin Executive Severance Plan, The, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Management Development and Compensation Committee of the Company's Board of Directors, Lockheed Martin Savings Plan Administrative Committee All parties do not consent.. (Glenn, Abbey)
April 25, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Glenn, Abbey)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Abbey McLean Glenn on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Abbey McLean Glenn added to party Change Name for Claims Administrators of the Lockheed Martin Executive Severance Plan, The (pty:dft), Attorney Abbey McLean Glenn added to party Lockheed Martin Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Abbey McLean Glenn added to party Lockheed Martin Management Development and Compensation Committee of the Company's Board of Directors(pty:dft), Attorney Abbey McLean Glenn added to party Lockheed Martin Savings Plan Administrative Committee(pty:dft) (Glenn, Abbey)
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeremy P. Blumenfeld on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Jeremy P. Blumenfeld added to party Change Name for Claims Administrators of the Lockheed Martin Executive Severance Plan, The (pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy P. Blumenfeld added to party Lockheed Martin Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy P. Blumenfeld added to party Lockheed Martin Management Development and Compensation Committee of the Company's Board of Directors(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy P. Blumenfeld added to party Lockheed Martin Savings Plan Administrative Committee(pty:dft) (Blumenfeld, Jeremy)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey Douglas Wood. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Email acknowledging waiver for all Defendants)(Davidovich, Nathan)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion to Appear at Scheduling Conference by Telephone, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 3/26/2019. (slibi, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Jeffrey Douglas Wood. (Davidovich, Nathan)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 3/20/2019. Consent/Non-Consent Form due on or before 5/23/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 6/6/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (slibi, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #4 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00795-NRN. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (cmadr, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6585437)Attorney Nathan Davidovich added to party Jeffrey Douglas Wood(pty:pla), filed by Jeffrey Douglas Wood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davidovich, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Lockheed Martin Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Douglas Wood
Represented By: Eileen R. Lerman
Represented By: Nathan Davidovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Abbey McLean Glenn
Represented By: Jeremy P. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Savings Plan Administrative Committee
Represented By: Abbey McLean Glenn
Represented By: Jeremy P. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claims Administrators of the Lockheed Martin Executive Severance Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Management Development and Compensation Committee of the Company's Board of Directors
Represented By: Abbey McLean Glenn
Represented By: Jeremy P. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Change Name for Claims Administrators of the Lockheed Martin Executive Severance Plan, The
Represented By: Abbey McLean Glenn
Represented By: Jeremy P. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation a Maryland Corporation authorized to do business in the State of Colorado, doing business as Lockheed Martin Aeronautics doing business as Lockheed Martin Mission Systems and Training doing business as SIM Industries BV do
Represented By: Abbey McLean Glenn
Represented By: Jeremy P. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?