Avila Arce v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Miguel Angel Avila Arce
Respondent: Ronald D Vitiello, Johnny Choate, William Barr, Jeffrey Lynch, Kirstjen Nielsen, Ronald D. Vitiello and Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Case Number: 1:2019cv00811
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241in
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 25 STATUS REPORT by Petitioner Miguel Angel Avila Arce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reyes Savalza, Luis)
April 23, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Hearing/Conference by Petitioner Miguel Angel Avila Arce. (Reyes Savalza, Luis)
April 23, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus,,,,,,, [Petitioner's Reply in Support of Writ of Habeas Corpus] by Petitioner Miguel Angel Avila Arce. (Reyes Savalza, Luis)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Page Limitations. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/9/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
April 8, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #14 by Respondents William Barr, Johnny Choate, Jeffrey Lynch, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Ronald D. Vitiello. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Vaughn Davison and Exhibits)(Wu, Zeyen)
April 4, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Respondents William Barr, Johnny Choate, Jeffrey Lynch, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Ronald D. Vitiello. (Wu, Zeyen)
April 3, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Zeyen Julian Wu on behalf of William Barr, Johnny Choate, Jeffrey Lynch, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Ronald D. VitielloAttorney Zeyen Julian Wu added to party William Barr(pty:res), Attorney Zeyen Julian Wu added to party Johnny Choate(pty:res), Attorney Zeyen Julian Wu added to party Jeffrey Lynch(pty:res), Attorney Zeyen Julian Wu added to party Kirstjen M. Nielsen(pty:res), Attorney Zeyen Julian Wu added to party Ronald D. Vitiello(pty:res) (Wu, Zeyen)
March 28, 2019 Filing 18 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #17 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00811-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Petitioner Miguel Angel Avila Arce All parties do not consent.. (Reyes Savalza, Luis)
March 26, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Writ of Habeas Corpus, Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration and Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, Application for Order to Show Cause, Order to Show Cause upon Registered Agent of GEO Group, Inc. on 3/25/2019, filed by Petitioner Miguel Angel Avila Arce (Reyes Savalza, Luis)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER Consent/Non-Consent Form due on or before 3/29/2019, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 3/22/2019. (slibi, )
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Respondents show cause within fifteen days from the date of this Order why the Application should not be granted, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 3/22/2019. (slibi, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED. The case was assigned incorrectly to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00811-NRN. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Writ of Habeas Corpus, Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration and Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, Application for Order to Show Cause upon Johnny Choate on March 19, 2019, filed by Petitioner Miguel Angel Avila Arce (Passamaneck, Nora)
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was drawn in error. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00811-GPG. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus,,,,,,, #2 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Petitioner Miguel Angel Avila Arce. (Perry, Daniel)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00811-NRN. (athom, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Sean Perry on behalf of Miguel Angel Avila ArceAttorney Daniel Sean Perry added to party Miguel Angel Avila Arce(pty:pet) (Perry, Daniel)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nora Quinto Passamaneck on behalf of Miguel Angel Avila ArceAttorney Nora Quinto Passamaneck added to party Miguel Angel Avila Arce(pty:pet) (Passamaneck, Nora)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mary Virginia Sooter on behalf of Miguel Angel Avila ArceAttorney Mary Virginia Sooter added to party Miguel Angel Avila Arce(pty:pet) (Sooter, Mary)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Petitioner Miguel Angel Avila Arce. (Reyes Savalza, Luis)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 (Filing fee $ 5, Receipt Number 1082-6587594)Attorney Luis Angel Reyes Savalza added to party Miguel Angel Avila Arce(pty:pet), filed by Miguel Angel Avila Arce. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Declaration of Luis Angel Reyes Savalza, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to Declaration, #9 Exhibit G to Declaration, #10 Exhibit H to Declaration, #11 Exhibit I to Declaration, #12 Exhibit J to Declaration, #13 Exhibit K to Declaration, #14 Exhibit L to Declaration, #15 Exhibit M to Declaration, #16 Exhibit N to Declaration, #17 Exhibit O to Declaration, #18 Exhibit P to Declaration, #19 Exhibit Q to Declaration, #20 Exhibit R to Declaration, #21 Exhibit S to Declaration, #22 Exhibit T to Declaration, #23 Exhibit U to Declaration, #24 Exhibit V to Declaration, #25 Exhibit W to Declaration, #26 Exhibit X to Declaration, #27 Exhibit Y to Declaration, #28 Exhibit Z to Declaration, #29 Exhibit AA to Declaration, #30 Exhibit BB to Declaration, #31 Exhibit CC to Declaration, #32 Exhibit DD to Declaration, #33 Exhibit EE to Declaration, #34 Exhibit FF to Declaration, #35 Exhibit GG to Declaration, #36 Exhibit HH to Declaration, #37 Exhibit II to Declaration, #38 Exhibit JJ to Declaration, #39 Exhibit KK to Declaration, #40 Exhibit LL to Declaration, #41 Exhibit MM to Declaration, #42 Exhibit NN to Declaration, #43 Exhibit OO to Declaration, #44 Exhibit PP to Declaration, #45 Exhibit QQ to Declaration, #46 Exhibit RR to Declaration, #47 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reyes Savalza, Luis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avila Arce v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald D Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Johnny Choate
Represented By: Zeyen Julian Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Zeyen Julian Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Lynch
Represented By: Zeyen Julian Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald D. Vitiello
Represented By: Zeyen Julian Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Represented By: Zeyen Julian Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miguel Angel Avila Arce
Represented By: Daniel Sean Perry
Represented By: Mary Virginia Sooter
Represented By: Luis Angel Reyes Savalza
Represented By: Nora Quinto Passamaneck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?