Havlicek v. Antonson

Plaintiff: Eva Havlicek
Defendant: Robert B. Antonson, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00823
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service by E-Mail by Clerk of Court re #11 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court to natascha.wise@judicial.state.co.us and marizela.cano@judicial.state.co.us. (slibi, )
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion to Remand, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 3/20/2019. ORDERED that this case is REMANDED to the Boulder County District Court, Colorado for further proceedings. (slibi, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Defendant Robert B. Antonson, Jr. (Crowley, Thomas)
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #8 Order to Harvey L. Kramer, Kramer Law LLC, 4101 E. Louisiana Ave., Ste 108, Denver CO 80246. Text Only Entry (slibi, )
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 3/20/2019. Consent/Non-Consent Form due on or before 5/22/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 6/5/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (slibi, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Robert B. Antonson, Jr. on 02/27/2019. (rvill, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Robert B. Antonson, Jr, filed by Eva Havlicek.(rvill, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Adventure OffRoad for Robert B. Antonson Jr.. (Crowley, Thomas)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Robert B. Antonson, Jr from Boulder County District Court, Case Number 2019cv30231. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6589475), filed by Robert B. Antonson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Sec of State Docs, #3 Exhibit C- State Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D-Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit E- Notice of Intent to Remove, #6 Exhibit F- Summons, #7 Exhibit G - Register of Actions)(Crowley, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Havlicek v. Antonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert B. Antonson, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Havlicek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?