Assurance Contractors Inc v. Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The

Plaintiff: Assurance Contractors Inc
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv00834
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Jeffrey Furtado on behalf of Assurance Contractors IncAttorney David Jeffrey Furtado added to party Assurance Contractors Inc(pty:pla) (Furtado, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nathanael Thomas Archuleta on behalf of Assurance Contractors IncAttorney Nathanael Thomas Archuleta added to party Assurance Contractors Inc(pty:pla) (Archuleta, Nathanael)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/18/19. (lgale, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION Order by Plaintiff Assurance Contractors Inc. (Monheit, Rodney)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/4/19. (lgale, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/4/2019. Discovery due by 1/17/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/14/2020. Status Report due by 1/21/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/2/2020 1:30 PM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. FTR: KLM Courtroom A401. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Procedures and Requirements of Practice) (lgale, )
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2018 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/ 3/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Magistrate Judge Mix, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/3/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #15 Minute Order. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00834-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, ) .
May 28, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The. (Walls, William)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/11/19. This matter is before the Court on the parties Consent/Non-Consent Form [#14], in which the parties inform the Court that at least one party in this civil action does not consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (nmarb, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The All parties do not consent.. (Walls, William)
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew Wayne Hamblin on behalf of Assurance Contractors IncAttorney Matthew Wayne Hamblin added to party Assurance Contractors Inc(pty:pla) (Hamblin, Matthew)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/28/19. Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (lgale, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The.(Walls, William)
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rodney Joseph Monheit on behalf of Assurance Contractors IncAttorney Rodney Joseph Monheit added to party Assurance Contractors Inc(pty:pla) (Monheit, Rodney)
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Denver County District Court Judge Brian R Whitney on 03/11/2019. (rroge, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The on 2/20/2019 (rroge, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rroge, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The, filed by Assurance Contractors Inc.(rroge, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rroge, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy M. Samberg on behalf of The Travelers Indemnity Company of America (Samberg, Amy)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Indemnity Co. of America, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Travelers Indemnity Company of America. (Walls, William)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Indemnity Company of America from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2019CV30677. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6592042), filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walls, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Assurance Contractors Inc v. Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The
Represented By: Amy M. Samberg
Represented By: William Ryan Walls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assurance Contractors Inc
Represented By: Rodney Joseph Monheit
Represented By: David Jeffrey Furtado
Represented By: Nathanael Thomas Archuleta
Represented By: Matthew Wayne Hamblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?