Jannen v. Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Plaintiff: Jan Jannen
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv00851
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Stay by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/1/2019. All deadlines in this matter are hereby STAYED, and the Parties shall file appropriate dismissal papers by 8/5/2019. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM regarding #24 Joint MOTION to Stay All Pending Deadlines and Notice of Settlement filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/27/19. Text Only Entry (cmalc1)
June 25, 2019 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Stay All Pending Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Kamps, Julie)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/30/19. (babia)
May 30, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/30/2019. Adm Defendants Brief due by 2/3/2020., Adm Plaintiffs Brief due by 1/6/2020. The Proposed Scheduling Order is approved and entered with interlineations made by the Court. FTR: B. Abiakam. (babia)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang: Magistrate Judge Wang is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/23/19. Text Only Entry (cmalc1)
May 23, 2019 Filing 20 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #19 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00851-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America, The All parties do not consent.. (Kamps, Julie)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER re: 17 Minute Order. Pursuant to counsel's telephonic request, the Parties shall submit the completed Consent/Nonconsent Form no later than close of business Tuesday, May 21, 2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/17/2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to #7 Order, the Parties were to file a completed Consent/Nonconsent Form to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. Though the Parties indicate that they do not consent in their Proposed Scheduling Order, this court requires the Parties to complete and file the actual Consent/Nonconsent Form. Accordingly, by close of business today, May 17, the Parties shall file a completed Consent/Nonconsent Form. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/17/2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed Scheduling Order (Joint Scheduling Order In An ERISA Action) by Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (Kamps, Julie)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave. Attorney Julie Kamps may appear telephonically at the Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2019 by contacting chambers at 303.335.2600 at the designated time. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/14/2019. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically At The Scheduling And Planning Conference by Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Kamps, Julie)
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (Kamps, Julie)
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative And Additional Defenses To Plaintiff's Complaint by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The.(Kamps, Julie)
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Prudential Insurance Company of America for Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (Moseley, Jeremy)
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jeremy A. Moseley by Jeremy A. Moseley on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company of America, TheAttorney Jeremy A. Moseley added to party Prudential Insurance Company of America, The(pty:dft) (Moseley, Jeremy)
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint (Joint Stipulation To An Extension Of Time To Answer Or Othewise Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint) by Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. Prudential Insurance Company of America, The answer due 5/9/2019. (Kamps, Julie)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER/CLARIFICATION: Scheduling Conference is set for 5/30/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/1/2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/22/2019. A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/30/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed order in Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 5/16/2019. The parties shall complete and file the Consent/Nonconsent Form by 5/16/2019. (bwilk, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00851-NYW. (athom, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Prudential Insurance Company of America, The by Plaintiff Jan Jannen. (Krieger, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prudential Insurance Company of America, The (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6594433)Attorney Michael Scott Krieger added to party Jan Jannen(pty:pla), filed by Jan Jannen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Krieger, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jannen v. Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Jannen
Represented By: Michael Scott Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Represented By: Jeremy A. Moseley
Represented By: Julie Melissa Kamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?