LaSala v. Millard et al
Plaintiff: Emily Rose LaSala
Defendant: John A. Millard and John A. Millard, M.D., P.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00857
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 9/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 8/28/2019. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #3 ) is due 8/28/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/8/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
July 4, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Emily Rose LaSala. John A. Millard waiver sent on 6/1/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Dolce, Adam)
July 4, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Emily Rose LaSala. John A. Millard, M.D., P.C. waiver sent on 6/1/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Dolce, Adam)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #5 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Emily Rose LaSala (Dolce, Adam)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Emily Rose LaSala. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returnable Amended Summons: Millard PC, #2 Summons Returnable Amended Summons: Millard)(Dolce, Adam)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Substitution of Attorney by Plaintiff Emily Rose LaSala. (Dolce, Adam)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. Summons Issued in Paper Format in the Clerks Office. (rroge, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John A. Millard, M.D., P.C., John A. Millard Filing Fee: 400.00 Receipt Number: COX089504, filed by Emily Rose LaSala. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rroge, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaSala v. Millard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Millard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Millard, M.D., P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Rose LaSala
Represented By: Adam David Dolce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?