Berge Air, LLC v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: Berge Air, LLC
Defendant: Air Power Financial Group, LLC, Robert Eugene Smith, Robert E. Smith and Air Power
Case Number: 1:2019cv00858
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Text Only Entry Proposed Scheduling Order due no later than 10/17/2019. (nmarb, )
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/14/19 GRANTING #9 Motion To Extend Service Deadline. Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/19 at 10:30 AM is VACATED and RESET to 10/24/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Parties shall submit their proposed schedulingorder pursuant to the District of Colorado Electronic Case Filing (ECF) Procedures. The parties shall submit the proposed scheduling order no later than October 17, 2019. (nmarb, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Service Deadline by Plaintiff Berge Air, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - C, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order to Extend Service Deadline)(Iannitelli, Claudio)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/28/19. Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (lgale, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits to Complaint by Plaintiff Berge Air, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3)(Iannitelli, Claudio)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Robert E. Smith by Plaintiff Berge Air, LLC. (Iannitelli, Claudio)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Air Power Financial Group, LLC by Plaintiff Berge Air, LLC. (Iannitelli, Claudio)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. The summonses submitted are incomplete and not issued. Please file completed summonses for issuance using the event Summons Request. (rsams, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Air Power Financial Group, LLC, Robert Eugene Smith (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6595172)Attorney Claudio Eduardo Iannitelli added to party Berge Air, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Berge Air, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons Air Power, #3 Summons Summons Robert E. Smith)(Iannitelli, Claudio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berge Air, LLC v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Power Financial Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Eugene Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berge Air, LLC
Represented By: Claudio Eduardo Iannitelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?