Good Funds Lending, LLC v. Westcor Land Title Insurance Company

Petitioner: Good Funds Lending, LLC
Respondent: Westcor Land Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00861
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Respondent Westcor Land Title Insurance Company. (Hunt, Amy)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Vacate, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/17/2019. The Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2019 is VACATED. A temporary stay of all deadlines is imposed until further order of the Court.(tsher, )
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM regarding #23 MOTION to Vacate #21 Minute Order filed by Good Funds Lending, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/17/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
May 16, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Vacate #21 Minute Order by Petitioner Good Funds Lending, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Holleyman, Kirk)
May 15, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Petitioner Good Funds Lending, LLC. (Holleyman, Kirk)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/01/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2019 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, )
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/30/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/30/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
April 29, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Robert E. Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00861-RM-MEH. (sphil, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 17 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #15 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00861-REB. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER re: #15 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Good Funds Lending, LLC by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/29/2019. Parties do not consent. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). (tsher, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Petitioner Good Funds Lending, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Holleyman, Kirk)
April 24, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Respondent Westcor Land Title Insurance Company. (Hunt, Amy)
April 15, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Hunt, Amy)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to ComplaintAttorney Amy Katherine Hunt added to party Westcor Land Title Insurance Company(pty:res) by Westcor Land Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Initial Claim, #2 Exhibit B - GFL's Request and Motion for Modification, #3 Exhibit C - Westcor's Response to GFL's Request and Motion for Modification, #4 Exhibit D - Arbitrator's Order re GFL's Request and Motion for Modification, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Tender, #6 Exhibit F - Correspondence between Hoffman and Westcor)(Hunt, Amy)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Magistrate Judge Consent Form by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 04/15/2019. Consent Form due by 4/26/2019. (mdave, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Magistrate Judge Consent Form by Petitioner Good Funds Lending, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Holleyman, Kirk)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT re #6 Summons Issued of Service by Petitioner Good Funds Lending, LLC. (Holleyman, Kirk)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/25/2019. Consent Form due by 4/12/2019. (mdave, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tsher, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Westcor Land Title Insurance Company, a California corporation, a/k/a Westcor Land Title Insurance Company, a South Carolina corporation by Petitioner Good Funds Lending, LLC. (Holleyman, Kirk)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #1 Petition/Application, Amended Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration Award and Entry of Judgment by Petitioner Good Funds Lending, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit Arbitration Agreement, #3 Exhibit ALTA Rules, #4 Exhibit Forum Code, #5 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Amended Proposed Order)(Holleyman, Kirk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Westcor Land Title Insurance Company by Petitioner Good Funds Lending, LLC. (Holleyman, Kirk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Confirmation of Arbitration Award and Entry of Judgment (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6595310)Attorney Kirk Bradford Holleyman added to party Good Funds Lending, LLC(pty:pet), filed by Good Funds Lending, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit Arbitration Agreement, #3 Exhibit ALTA Rules, #4 Exhibit Forum Code, #5 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet)(Holleyman, Kirk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Good Funds Lending, LLC v. Westcor Land Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Westcor Land Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy Katherine Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Good Funds Lending, LLC
Represented By: Kirk Bradford Holleyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?