Tivis v. City of Colorado Springs et al

Plaintiff: Kelvin Tivis
Defendant: Korey Hutchinson, City of Colorado Springs, Brian Makofske, Ronald Carter and Robert Comstock
Case Number: 1:2019cv00867
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER granting #24 Motion for Protective Order and to Vacate Scheduling Conference. The court is satisfied that the factors outlined in String Cheese Incident, LLC v. Stylus Shows, Inc., 1:02-CV-01934-LTB-PA, 2006 WL 894955, *2 (D. Colo. Mar. 30, 2006), have been met and that a stay of proceedings is appropriate. This case is STAYED pending ruling on the defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Scheduling Conference set for June 3, 2019, is VACATED, to be reset after ruling on the Motion to Dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/29/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
May 29, 2019 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and to Vacate the Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference by Defendants Ronald Carter, City of Colorado Springs, Robert Comstock, Korey Hutchinson, Brian Makofske. (Lamphere, William)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF REFERENCE Upon Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/28/2019. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00867-KMT. (sphil, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 22 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants Ronald Carter, City of Colorado Springs, Robert Comstock, Korey Hutchinson, Brian Makofske. (Lamphere, William)
May 28, 2019 Filing 21 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Ronald Carter, City of Colorado Springs, Robert Comstock, Korey Hutchinson, Brian Makofske All parties consent.. (Lamphere, William)
May 28, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Ronald Carter, City of Colorado Springs, Robert Comstock, Korey Hutchinson, Brian Makofske. (Lamphere, William)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/23/2019. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a) and the direction of the Chief Judge, the Clerk of Court shall cause this case to be directly returned to Judge Philip A Brimmer. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 This action is reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico, upon his appointment. Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Judge Domenico in Courtroom A-702. His chambers are located in A-738 of the Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse. His telephone number is 303-335-2468. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00867-DDD-KMT. (Text Only Entry). (sphil, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Kelvin Tivis. (Tolini, Joshua)
May 10, 2019 Filing 16 Defendants Robert Comstock, Brian Makofske ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Unlawful Entry Claim, Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Ronald Carter, City of Colorado Springs, Robert Comstock, Korey Hutchinson, Brian Makofske.(Lamphere, William) Modified on 5/14/2019 to edit text. (sphil, ).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave or Extension to File an Answer. Defendants Comstock and Makofske shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than May 13, 2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/7/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
May 7, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM regarding #13 MOTION for Leave to or Extension to file an answer filed by Ronald Carter, Korey Hutchinson, Brian Makofske, Robert Comstock, City of Colorado Springs. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/7/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
May 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to or Extension to file an answer by Defendants Ronald Carter, City of Colorado Springs, Robert Comstock, Korey Hutchinson, Brian Makofske. (Lamphere, William)
April 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Ronald Carter, City of Colorado Springs, Robert Comstock, Korey Hutchinson, Brian Makofske. (Lamphere, William)
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (cthom, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to City of Colorado Springs, Robert Comstock, Ronald Carter, Brian Makofske,Korey Hutchinson by Plaintiff Kelvin Tivis. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tolini, Joshua)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 Administrative Notice: Summons submitted is blank and not issued. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (Text Only Entry). (sphil, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to City of Colorado Springs, Robert Comstock, Ronald Carter,Brian Makofske, Korey Hutchinson,Unknown Officers re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Kelvin Tivis. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tolini, Joshua)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/3/2019 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/26/2019. (ksena)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/25/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Kelvin Tivis (Tolini, Joshua)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rroge, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was originally assigned using the incorrect assignment deck for the Magistrate Judge and therefore, it is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry) (rroge, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Ronald Carter, City of Colorado Springs, Robert Comstock, Korey Hutchinson, Brian Makofske, Other officers unknown (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6595866)Attorney Joshua N. Tolini added to party Kelvin Tivis(pty:pla), filed by Kelvin Tivis.(Tolini, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tivis v. City of Colorado Springs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Korey Hutchinson
Represented By: William Erik Lamphere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Colorado Springs
Represented By: William Erik Lamphere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Makofske
Represented By: William Erik Lamphere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Carter
Represented By: William Erik Lamphere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Comstock
Represented By: William Erik Lamphere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Tivis
Represented By: Joshua N. Tolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?