Chase Manufacturing, Inc. v. Johns Manville Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Chase Manufacturing, Inc.
Defendant: Industrial Insulation Group, LLC and Johns Manville Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00872
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #18 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 07/03/2019. Plaintiff's #1 Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an Amended Complaint no later than 7/24/2019. (mdave, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 27 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty taking under advisement #18 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Motion Hearing held on 6/18/2019. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jarod Bona by Jarod Michael Bona on behalf of Chase Manufacturing, Inc.Attorney Jarod Michael Bona added to party Chase Manufacturing, Inc.(pty:pla) (Bona, Jarod)
June 12, 2019 Filing 25 BRIEF in Support of #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted filed by Defendants Industrial Insulation Group, LLC, Johns Manville Corporation. (Kerwin, Gregory)
June 5, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted filed by Plaintiff Chase Manufacturing, Inc.. (Blue, Geoffrey)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/28/2019. (jgonz, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 22 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty granting in part #21 Motion to Stay Discovery. Scheduling Conference held on 5/28/2019. Motion Hearing re: #18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted is set for 6/18/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Status Conference set for 10/15/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending a Decision on Their Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Industrial Insulation Group, LLC, Johns Manville Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kerwin, Gregory)
May 21, 2019 Filing 20 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Chase Manufacturing, Inc.. (Blue, Geoffrey)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #14 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/15/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
May 15, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted by Defendants Industrial Insulation Group, LLC, Johns Manville Corporation. (Kerwin, Gregory)
May 15, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Allison Kaye Kostecka on behalf of Industrial Insulation Group, LLC, Johns Manville CorporationAttorney Allison Kaye Kostecka added to party Industrial Insulation Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Kaye Kostecka added to party Johns Manville Corporation(pty:dft) (Kostecka, Allison)
May 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard Hale Cunningham on behalf of Industrial Insulation Group, LLC, Johns Manville CorporationAttorney Richard Hale Cunningham added to party Industrial Insulation Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Hale Cunningham added to party Johns Manville Corporation(pty:dft) (Cunningham, Richard)
May 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gregory J. Kerwin on behalf of Industrial Insulation Group, LLC, Johns Manville CorporationAttorney Gregory J. Kerwin added to party Industrial Insulation Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory J. Kerwin added to party Johns Manville Corporation(pty:dft) (Kerwin, Gregory)
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Chase Manufacturing, Inc. All parties consent.. (Blue, Geoffrey)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 04/10/2019. Industrial Insulation Group, LLC answer due 5/15/2019; Johns Manville Corporation answer due 5/15/2019. (mdave, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Johns Manville Corporation for Industrial Insulation Group, LLC, Johns Manville Corporation. (Twisselman, Roger)
April 10, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint with Jury Demand by Defendants Industrial Insulation Group, LLC, Johns Manville Corporation. (Twisselman, Roger)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/28/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2019 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #7 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00872-MEH. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chase Manufacturing, Inc.. Industrial Insulation Group, LLC served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Blue, Geoffrey)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chase Manufacturing, Inc.. Johns Manville Corporation served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Blue, Geoffrey)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Blue, Geoffrey)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chase Manufacturing, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6596900)Attorney Geoffrey N. Blue added to party Chase Manufacturing, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Chase Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Johns Manville Corporation, #3 Summons Industrial Insulation Group, LLC)(Blue, Geoffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chase Manufacturing, Inc. v. Johns Manville Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Insulation Group, LLC
Represented By: Gregory J. Kerwin
Represented By: Roger P. Twisselman
Represented By: Allison Kaye Kostecka
Represented By: Richard Hale Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johns Manville Corporation
Represented By: Gregory J. Kerwin
Represented By: Roger P. Twisselman
Represented By: Allison Kaye Kostecka
Represented By: Richard Hale Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey N. Blue
Represented By: Jarod Michael Bona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?