IHS Markit, LTD v. Colliers International WA, LLC
Plaintiff: IHS Markit, LTD
Defendant: Colliers International WA, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00876
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: John L Kane
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge John L. Kane on 6/13/2019.(cthom, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Colliers International WA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Stipulated Protective Order)(Seelman, Todd)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER by Judge John L. Kane on 6/5/2019. (cthom, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane on 6/5/2019. Scheduling Order APPROVED and SIGNED. Court Reporter: Terri Lindblom. (babia)
May 29, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff IHS Markit, LTD. (Schwartz, Paul)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. This case is set for a Scheduling Conference at 10:30 a.m. on Wednesday, June 5, 2019, before Judge John L. Kane in Courtroom A802 on the 8th floor of the Alfred A. Arraj U.S. Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall prepare and file a Stipulated Scheduling and Discovery Order on or before Wednesday, May 29, 2019. See instructions for proper formatting of this order in Judge Kane's Pretrial and Trial Procedures Memorandum, available on the court's website at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/Home.aspx (Select Judge Kane under "Judicial Officers," "Senior Article III Judges"). A form of order is also available on the website, and the parties' proposed Scheduling Order should follow the example provided, which is different from those used by magistrate and other judges of this court. Judge Kane requests that an editable version of the Stipulated Scheduling Order be emailed to chambers as well, at Kane_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. Counsel and pro se litigants shall read and strictly adhere to all instructions in the Judge's Pretrial and Trial Procedures Memorandum. Particular attention is called to Part III, regarding motions for summary judgment. Ordered by Judge John L. Kane on 4/24/2019. Text Only Entry (jlksec)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER. An answer having been filed, this matter is ready for a scheduling conference. Counsel shall consult Judge Kane's Pretrial and Trial Procedures Memorandum, available on the court's website, www.cod.uscourts.gov, under "Judicial Officers," "Senior Article III Judges," and call in JOINTLY on or before April 26, 2019, to set a date and time for the conference, 303-844-6118. Ordered by Judge John L. Kane on 4/19/2019. Text Only Entry (jlksec)
April 19, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Seelman, Todd)
April 19, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Colliers International WA, LLC.(Seelman, Todd)
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Colliers International WA, LLC. Colliers International WA, LLC answer due 4/19/2019. (Seelman, Todd)
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Arthur Biller on behalf of Colliers International WA, LLCAttorney Arthur Biller added to party Colliers International WA, LLC(pty:dft) (Biller, Arthur)
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Todd R. Seelman on behalf of Colliers International WA, LLC (Seelman, Todd)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Anderson Helfgott on behalf of IHS Markit, LTDAttorney Jonathan Anderson Helfgott added to party IHS Markit, LTD(pty:pla) (Helfgott, Jonathan)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul Howard Schwartz on behalf of IHS Markit, LTDAttorney Paul Howard Schwartz added to party IHS Markit, LTD(pty:pla) (Schwartz, Paul)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court by Defendant Colliers International WA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Seelman, Todd)
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal, Re-Filing of Exhibits to Notice of Removal by Defendant Colliers International WA, LLC (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Affidavit of Service, #3 State Court Delay Reduction Order & Order Regarding Plan for Settlement, #4 State Court Dispositive Motions Procedure Order, #5 State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #6 State Court Register of Actions and Party Information)(Seelman, Todd)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rroge, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rroge, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge John L. Kane and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). See Appendix B Notice of Removal, in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry) (rroge, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Colliers International WA, LLC from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2019CV30492. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6597137), filed by Colliers International WA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Seelman, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IHS Markit, LTD v. Colliers International WA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IHS Markit, LTD
Represented By: Paul Howard Schwartz
Represented By: Jonathan Anderson Helfgott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colliers International WA, LLC
Represented By: Todd R. Seelman
Represented By: Arthur Biller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?