Adolas, LLC v. Alexander Andrews & Associates, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ADOLAS, LLC
Defendant: ALEXANDER ANDREWS & ASSOCIATES, LLC, STEELE INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS, INC. and TCFG, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00881
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 27 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Alexander Andrews & Associates, LLC All parties consent.. (Thomas, Jeffrey)
June 24, 2019 Filing 26 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 6/24/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Jeffrey Thomas may appear by telephone. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 25 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to TCFG, LLC re #24 MOTION for Entry of Default, by Clerk. Text Only Entry (athom, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant TCFG, LLC by Plaintiff Adolas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brett Payton, Esq.)(Payton, Brett)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/20/2019 re: #22 Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Adolas, LLC. Scheduling Conference is converted into a Status Conference and is set for 6/24/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 22 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Adolas, LLC. (Payton, Brett)
June 18, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to #14 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Alexander Andrews & Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Thomas, Jeffrey)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTE REGARDING DEFAULT. Default will not be entered as to TCFG, LLC re #19 MOTION for Entry of Default as: the affidavit or declaration required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a) was not filed, by Clerk. Text Only Entry (athom, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Entry of Default as to by Plaintiff Adolas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Substitute Service on TCFG, LLC)(Payton, Brett)
June 6, 2019 Filing 18 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #17 Response to Motion, filed by attorney Brett D. Payton. The format for the attorneys signature block is not correct. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #14 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Adolas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Demand Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email from Aubrey Alexander, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email from Alan Edmondson, #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Robert Bailey, #5 Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of Cameron Lee)(Payton, Brett)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 This action is reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico, upon his appointment. Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Judge Domenico in Courtroom A-702. His chambers are located in A-738 of the Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse. His telephone number is 303-335-2468. All future pleadings 19-cv-00881-DDD. Text only entry. (agarc, )
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM regarding #14 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Alexander Andrews & Associates, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/14/19. Text Only Entry (cmalc1)
May 14, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Alexander Andrews & Associates, LLC. (Thomas, Jeffrey)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #12 Motion for Default Judgment as premature and without prejudice. The docket does not reflect that default has been entered against Defendant TCFG, LLC. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55 for proper sequential filing procedure. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/8/19. Text Only Entry(cmalc1)
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant TCFG, LLC by Plaintiff Adolas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service on TCFG, LLC)(Payton, Brett)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Joint Motion for 31-Day Extension to File Proposed Scheduling Order and to Meet for Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 04/29/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2019 is vacated and rescheduled to 6/24/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty.(mdave, )
April 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM regarding #9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order and to meet for Scheduling Conference filed by Adolas, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/27/19. Text Only Entry (cmalc1)
April 26, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order and to meet for Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Adolas, LLC. (Payton, Brett)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Alexander Andrews & Associates, LLC. Alexander Andrews & Associates, LLC answer due 5/14/2019. (Thomas, Jeffrey)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (evana, )
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/25/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2019 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Alexander Andrews & Associates, LLC; TCFG, LLC; Steele International Holdings, Inc. re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Adolas, LLC. (Payton, Brett)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiffs counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 6/24/2019 in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/25/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Summonses submitted are incomplete and will not be issued. All summonses must identify the District in which the case was filed. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (cmadr, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against ADOLAS, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6598176)Attorney Brett D. Payton added to party ADOLAS, LLC(pty:pla), filed by ADOLAS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Escrow Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Receipt of Transfer from Adolas to RossLaw, #3 Exhibit 3 - Receipt of Transfer from RossLaw to TCFG, #4 Summons Summons in a Civil Action, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Payton, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adolas, LLC v. Alexander Andrews & Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER ANDREWS & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEELE INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCFG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADOLAS, LLC
Represented By: Brett D. Payton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?