Simon v. Borrego et al
Plaintiff: Eddie L. Simon, Jr.
Defendant: Deborah N. Borrego, Diane V. Forget and DOC Director of Inmate Housing and Re-location
Case Number: 1:2019cv00890
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/11/2019, r: #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File is GRANTED and Plaintiff shall have up to and including July 31, 2019, to file a second amended complaint.(sphil, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Eddie L. Simon, Jr. (sphil, )
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file an Second Amended Complaint that complies with this Order within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/31/2019. (sphil, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT against Deborah N. Borrego, DOC Director of Inmate Housing and Re-location, Diane V. Forget, filed by Eddie L. Simon, Jr.(sphil, )
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Complaint that complies with this Order within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/30/2019. (sphil, )
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. The Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #5 ) is granted. The Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #6 ) is denied as premature, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/29/2019.(agarc, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Eddie L. Simon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sphil, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Eddie L. Simon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sphil, )
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/27/2019. (sphil, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION in Support of Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Eddie L. Simon, Jr. (rvill, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against Deborah N. Borrego, DOC Director of Inmate Housing and Re-location, and Diane V. Forget, filed by Eddie L. Simon, Jr.(rvill, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon v. Borrego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah N. Borrego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane V. Forget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOC Director of Inmate Housing and Re-location
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie L. Simon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?