APL Microscopic, LLC v. Cruz Bay Publishing, Inc.

Plaintiff: APL Microscopic, LLC
Defendant: Cruz Bay Publishing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00907
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
2 Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Serge Wenzel on behalf of APL Microscopic, LLCAttorney William Serge Wenzel added to party APL Microscopic, LLC(pty:pla) (Wenzel, William)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #19 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone. The Motion is GRANTED. The Court finds good cause for Defendant's Attorney to appear by telephone because he is located in El Paso, Texas. See SKC's Civil Practice Standards D. The Court granted this motion immediately before the Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Crews. Defense counsel appeared by telephone. (See ECF. #21 ). SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/28/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/28/19. (amont, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 21 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews: Scheduling Conference held on 5/28/2019. Discovery due by 12/4/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2020. Joint Status Report due by 8/12/2019. Telephone Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/25/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Counsel participating in the conference shall jointly call the Court (303.335.2124) at the scheduled time. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (amont, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM regarding #19 Defendant Cruz Bay Publishing, Inc.'s Motion to Appear Via Telephone. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/28/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc3)
May 27, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear for Scheduling Conference via Telephone by Defendant Cruz Bay Publishing, Inc.. (Walker, Mark)
May 22, 2019 Filing 18 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses, #14 Proposed Scheduling Order filed by attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, ) Modified on 5/22/2019 to create linkage (athom, ).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/22/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc3)
May 22, 2019 Filing 16 CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent pursuant to #15 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00907-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff APL Microscopic, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
May 21, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff APL Microscopic, LLC. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses. For good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's deadline to File a Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses is 5/31/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/20/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses by Plaintiff APL Microscopic, LLC. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant Cruz Bay Publishing, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Mark Callis Walker added to party Cruz Bay Publishing, Inc.(pty:dft) by Cruz Bay Publishing, Inc..(Walker, Mark)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 5/28/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 5/21/2019. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #8 ) is due 5/21/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/15/2019. (skclc2, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by APL Microscopic, LLC. Cruz Bay Publishing, Inc. served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #6 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00907-SKC. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (cmadr, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney.Joel B. Rothman.. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement (Injunctive Relief Demanded) against Cruz Bay Publishing, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6603973)Attorney Joel B. Rothman added to party APL Microscopic, LLC(pty:pla), filed by APL Microscopic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Rothman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: APL Microscopic, LLC v. Cruz Bay Publishing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APL Microscopic, LLC
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Represented By: William Serge Wenzel
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cruz Bay Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Callis Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?