Singh v. Choate
Petitioner: Surjit Singh
Respondent: Ronald Vitiello, Jeffrey D Lynch, Johnny Choate, Kirstjen M. Nielsen and William P. Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv00909
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #26 Response to Amended Habeas Petition, #33 Minute Order, to Surjit Singh, A079602619, ICE Aurora Processing Center-GEO Detention Facility, A3, 11901 East 30th Avenue, Aurora, CO 80010. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/11/19 re: #32 Letter filed by Surjit Singh. Petitioners request for a copy of the government's response is granted. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to mail Petitioner one copy of the Respondents Response to Order to Show Cause and the attachment thereto (ECF Nos. 26 and 26-1), along with a copy of this Minute Order, at his address of record listed on the docket. Finally, the Court will provide Petitioner with additional time to file a reply to the Respondents Response to Order to Show Cause. Petitioner may file a reply within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Minute Order. (nmarb, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 32 LETTER re: #22 Order to Show Cause, requesting a status update, by Petitioner Surjit Singh. (nmarb, )
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #27 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/13/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
June 10, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE from Special Assistant United States Attorney W. Dean Carter, that the Plaintiff plans to consent to United States Magistrate Jurisdiction. (nmarb, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Order To Show Cause, upon Johnny Choate on 5/21/19, filed by Petitioner Surjit Singh. (nmarb, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 27 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Respondent Johnny Choate All parties consent.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Carter, William)
June 4, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to #17 Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Johnny Choate. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Lauciello)(Carter, William)
June 3, 2019 Filing 25 Consent Form due by 6/24/2019. Text Only Entry (lgale, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service by Certified Mail as to #23 upon United States Attorney General on 5/29/19, filed by Petitioner Surjit Singh. (nmarb, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Dean Carter on behalf of Johnny ChoateAttorney William Dean Carter added to party Johnny Choate(pty:res) (Carter, William)
May 15, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #17 Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #20 Order Drawing Case, #22 Order to Show Cause, (Attachments: #1 U.S. Marshal Service Forms, #2 US Postal Service Certified Mail Receipt) (rsams, )
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER to Show Cause. Respondent show cause within twenty-one days from the date of this Order why the Application should not be granted, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/14/2019. (angar, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 21 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Drawing Case, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/14/2019. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-909-KLM (angar, )
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER. Petitioner filed two motions titled Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action (ECF Nos. #15 and #18 ). Both motions are DENIED as moot because Petitioner has paid the filing fee (ECF No. #14 ), by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/14/2019.(angar, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 18 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action, by Petitioner Surjit Singh. (angar, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Surjit Singh, (angar, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Surjit Singh. (angar, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action, by Petitioner Surjit Singh. (angar, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number COX089704 (angar, )
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Directing Petitioner to Cure Deficiencies. If Petitioner fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/27/2019. (angar, ) forms mailed as ordered
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:19-cv-01249. File, transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF TRANSFER TO THE DISTRICT OF COLORADO. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/27/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 Prisoner Statement of Account. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/27/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Surjit Singh. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/27/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Surjit Singh.(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/27/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Surjit Singh. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/27/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Surjit Singh. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/27/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed by Surjit Singh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/27/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 4/15/2019. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/27/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/27/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed by Surjit Singh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/27/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey D Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Johnny Choate
Represented By: William Dean Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Surjit Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?