Waneka v. United Seating & Mobility, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Anthony Waneka
Defendant: Invacare Corporation and United Seating & Mobility, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00954
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/28/19. (morti, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 30 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/28/2019. Discovery due by 2/17/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/2/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5//2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. FTR: 402. (morti, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 29 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff James Anthony Waneka. (Scranton, Keith)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. The parties may appear telephonically for the Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2019 09:00 AM by initiating a call among all individuals participating by telephone and then calling the Court at 303.335.2365 at the scheduled time. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/20/2019. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Defendant United Seating & Mobility, LLC. (Speegle, Clinton)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #24 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/14/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
May 13, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kent Michael Lucaccioni on behalf of Invacare CorporationAttorney Kent Michael Lucaccioni added to party Invacare Corporation(pty:dft) (Lucaccioni, Kent)
May 10, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by Plaintiff James Anthony Waneka (Scranton, Keith)
April 18, 2019 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Derwinski, Anthony)
April 8, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Invacare Corporation.(Derwinski, Anthony)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/28/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 5/14/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/8/2019. (jgonz, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 20 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #19 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00954-STV. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
April 8, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
April 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anthony E. Derwinski on behalf of Invacare CorporationAttorney Anthony E. Derwinski added to party Invacare Corporation(pty:dft) (Derwinski, Anthony)
April 4, 2019 Filing 17 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (slibi, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amber Nicole Hall on behalf of United Seating & Mobility, LLCAttorney Amber Nicole Hall added to party United Seating & Mobility, LLC(pty:dft) (Hall, Amber)
April 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Clinton Timothy Speegle on behalf of United Seating & Mobility, LLCAttorney Clinton Timothy Speegle added to party United Seating & Mobility, LLC(pty:dft) (Speegle, Clinton)
April 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lee Maxwell Hollis on behalf of United Seating & Mobility, LLCAttorney Lee Maxwell Hollis added to party United Seating & Mobility, LLC(pty:dft) (Hollis, Lee)
April 3, 2019 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Order of Recusal. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel in the presider role and Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak in the referral role. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00954-WYD. (Text Only Entry) (slibi, )
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER re RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/03/2019. (slibi, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Craig Marlin, Sr on behalf of James Anthony WanekaAttorney William Craig Marlin, Sr added to party James Anthony Waneka(pty:pla) (Marlin, William)
April 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Keith Richard Scranton on behalf of James Anthony WanekaAttorney Keith Richard Scranton added to party James Anthony Waneka(pty:pla) (Scranton, Keith)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for United Seating and Mobility to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Boulder County District Court Judge Thomas Francis Mulvahill on 03/26/2019. (rroge, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon United Seating & Mobility, LLC on 03/04/2019 (rroge, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rroge, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rroge, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Invacare Corporation, United Seating & Mobility, LLC, filed by James Anthony Waneka.(rroge, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent NMN Holdings III., Corp. for United Seating & Mobility, LLC. (Oertle, Stephen)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by United Seating & Mobility, LLC.(Oertle, Stephen)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Seating & Mobility, LLC from Boulder County District Court, Case Number 2019CV30187. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6611907), filed by United Seating & Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - District Court Civil Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit E - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, #6 Exhibit F - Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit G - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, #8 Exhibit H - USDC Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Exhibit I - Demand Letter dated 11/29/18, #10 Exhibit J - Notice of Removal (State Court))(Oertle, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waneka v. United Seating & Mobility, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invacare Corporation
Represented By: Kent Michael Lucaccioni
Represented By: Anthony E. Derwinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Seating & Mobility, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Ernest Oertle
Represented By: Clinton Timothy Speegle
Represented By: Amber Nicole Hall
Represented By: Lee Maxwell Hollis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Anthony Waneka
Represented By: William Craig Marlin, Sr.
Represented By: Keith Richard Scranton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?