Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund et al v. Power Foundations, LLC
Plaintiff: National Electrical Benefit Fund, Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund, Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund Annuity Plan, Mountain States Line Constructors Area Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund and James Mantele
Defendant: Power Foundations, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00972
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTE REGARDING DEFAULT Default will not be entered as to Power Foundations, LLC re #14 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Power Foundations, LLC as no proof of service has been filed. Text Only Entry. (cthom, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Power Foundations, LLC by Plaintiffs Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund, Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund Annuity Plan, James Mantele, Mountain States Line Constructors Area Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Eric Beckemeier in Support of Entry of Default, #2 Proposed Document Proposed Entry of Default)(Beckemeier, Eric)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTE REGARDING DEFAULT Default will not be entered as to Power Foundations, LLC re #12 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Power Foundations, LLC as: the affidavit or declaration required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a) does not include the date service was complete, no proof of service has been filed, there is no signed receipt or if the affidavits of attempted service is the actual return ; there is no return certified mail Green card reflecting a signature and date of delivery; Certified mail is allowed if the defendant is a us agency or agent. Text Only Entry (evana, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Power Foundations, LLC by Plaintiffs Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund, Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund Annuity Plan, James Mantele, Mountain States Line Constructors Area Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Eric C. Beckemeier, #2 Proposed Document Entry of Default)(Beckemeier, Eric)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Scheduling Conference held on 6/12/2019. ORDERED: Plaintiff shall file a Motion for Clerks Entry of Default on or before June 28, 2019, or file a Status Report updating the Court on the status of the case. FTR: Courtroom C205. (slibi, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund, Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund Annuity Plan, James Mantele, Mountain States Line Constructors Area Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, National Electrical Benefit Fund. (Beckemeier, Eric)
June 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/1/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc2)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00972-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (slibi, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund, Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund Annuity Plan, James Mantele, Mountain States Line Constructors Area Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, National Electrical Benefit Fund All parties do not consent.. (Beckemeier, Eric)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Electrical Benefit Fund, Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund, James Mantele, Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund Annuity Plan, Mountain States Line Constructors Area Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund. Power Foundations, LLC served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Beckemeier, Eric)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/03/2019. Consent/Non-Consent Form due on or before 5/29/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 6/12/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (slibi, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM Exercising my prerogative as a Senior Judge, I request that this action be reassigned, by Judge John L. Kane. This case has been randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all further proceedings. (cthom, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge John L. Kane and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Power Foundations, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6614798)Attorney Eric Christian Beckemeier added to party Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Eric Christian Beckemeier added to party Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund Annuity Plan(pty:pla), Attorney Eric Christian Beckemeier added to party James Mantele(pty:pla), Attorney Eric Christian Beckemeier added to party Mountain States Line Constructors Area Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Eric Christian Beckemeier added to party National Electrical Benefit Fund(pty:pla), filed by National Electrical Benefit Fund, Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund, James Mantele, Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund Annuity Plan, Mountain States Line Constructors Area Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Beckemeier, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund et al v. Power Foundations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Electrical Benefit Fund
Represented By: Eric Christian Beckemeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund
Represented By: Eric Christian Beckemeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eighth District Electrical Pension Fund Annuity Plan
Represented By: Eric Christian Beckemeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain States Line Constructors Area Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Eric Christian Beckemeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mantele
Represented By: Eric Christian Beckemeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Foundations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?