Aubid v. Nielsen et al

Plaintiff: Basym AUBID
Defendant: ANDREW LAMBRECHT, Secretary KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, LEE CISSNA, ANGELA Kristi GOLDINGER, Kirstjen Nielsen, Angela K. Goldinger and Lee F. Cissna
Case Number: 1:2019cv00979
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1447
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 Civil Case ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pursuant to the 16 Order that this matter is remanded to the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services for adjudication of Plaintiff's application for naturalization, entered in this case on 6/18/2019. Text Only Entry (evana, )
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Joint Stipulated Motion to Remand. It is ORDERED that this matter is remanded to the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services for adjudication of Plaintiff's application for naturalization. The Clerk of the Court is directed to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE the above-referenced civil action until either (1) Plaintiff's naturalization application is resolved, or (2) 11/8/2019, unless one or both of the parties file a motion prior to that date requesting that this case be re-opened. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report with the Court (1) within 14 days of the date that Plaintiff's naturalization application is resolved, or (2) on 11/8/2019. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/18/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc3)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Remand to USCIS by Defendants Lee F. Cissna, Angela K. Goldinger, Andrew Lambrecht, Kirstjen Nielsen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bobet, Jane)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Reset. The Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2019 10:30 AM is VACATED and RESET for 6/27/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order on or before 6/20/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/28/2019. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, )
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM regarding #12 Parties' Joint Stipulated Motion to Reset June 3, 2019 Scheduling Conference and Extension of Time for Submission of Joint Proposed Scheduling Order. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/24/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc3)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference & Extend Deadine for Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Basym Aubid. (Casey, Jennifer)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/21/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc3)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent pursuant to #9 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00979-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Lee F. Cissna, Angela K. Goldinger, Andrew Lambrecht, Kirstjen Nielsen All parties do not consent.. (Bobet, Jane)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jane Elizabeth Bobet on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Jane Elizabeth Bobet added to party Lee F. Cissna(pty:dft), Attorney Jane Elizabeth Bobet added to party Angela K. Goldinger(pty:dft), Attorney Jane Elizabeth Bobet added to party Andrew Lambrecht(pty:dft), Attorney Jane Elizabeth Bobet added to party Kirstjen Nielsen(pty:dft) (Bobet, Jane)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Lee F. Cissna served on 4/15/2019, answer due 6/14/2019; Angela K. Goldinger served on 4/15/2019, answer due 6/14/2019; Andrew Lambrecht served on 4/15/2019, answer due 6/14/2019; Kirstjen Nielsen served on 4/15/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Casey, Jennifer)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/3/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 5/20/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/3/2019. (jgonz, )
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00979-STV. (athom, )
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6615586)Attorney David Lawrence Kolko added to party Basym AUBID(pty:pla), filed by Basym AUBID. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Summons Summons Request Nielsen, #9 Summons Summons Request Cissna, #10 Summons Summons Request Goldinger, #11 Summons Summons Request Lambrecht, #12 Summons Summons Request Barr, #13 Summons Summons Request Dunn)(Kolko, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aubid v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW LAMBRECHT
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Bobet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE CISSNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELA Kristi GOLDINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Bobet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela K. Goldinger
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Bobet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee F. Cissna
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Bobet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Basym AUBID
Represented By: David Lawrence Kolko
Represented By: Jennifer Rilen Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?