Oppenheimer v. EDM Network, LLC, The

Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Defendant: EDM Network, LLC, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv00984
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Pending before the court is Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal which seeks dismissal with prejudice. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) the dismissal is self-effectuating and no order is required. This case is closed. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7.8.2019. Text Only Entry(nywlc1, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff David Oppenheimer. (Arsenault, John)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Status Conference held on 5/28/2019 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Consent Form #3 due by 7/5/2019. The Scheduling Conference is RESET to 7/12/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed order in Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 7/5/2019. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (bwilk, )
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER : In the Order dated April 9, 2019 #8 the court set a 5/20/2019 deadline for submission of a completed Consent/Non-Consent Form. That deadline has passed with neither a completed form nor a motion for extension of time. Accordingly, a Status Conference is set for 5/28/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. In person attendance is mandatory. The Status Conference will automatically vacate upon the filing of a completed Consent/Non-Consent Form. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5.21.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/9/2019. A Scheduling Conference is set for 6/3/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed order in Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 5/28/2019. The parties shall complete and file the Consent/Nonconsent Form by 5/20/2019. (bwilk, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #5 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00984-NYW. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (rroge, )
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rroge, )
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The EDM Network, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6617224)Attorney John Allan Arsenault added to party David Oppenheimer(pty:pla), filed by David Oppenheimer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Arsenault, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oppenheimer v. EDM Network, LLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Represented By: John Allan Arsenault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDM Network, LLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?