Archer v. Akima, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dacqui D. Archer, Jr.
Defendant: Five Rivers Services, LLC and Akima, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01025
Filed: April 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 791
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SCHEDULING ORDER: By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 07/09/2019. (ksena)
July 9, 2019 Filing 34 COURTROOM MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Scheduling Conference held on 7/9/2019, ( Discovery due by 2/7/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 3/13/2020.). FTR: COURTROOM 101. (ksena)
July 2, 2019 Filing 33 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Dacqui D. Archer, Jr. (Robinson, Jennifer)
July 1, 2019 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/11/19 regarding #31 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) filed by Five Rivers Services, LLC, Akima, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
July 1, 2019 Filing 31 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) by Defendants Akima, LLC, Five Rivers Services, LLC. (Ward, Joseph)
July 1, 2019 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate NANA Regional Corporation, Other Affiliate NANA Development Corporation for Akima, LLC, Five Rivers Services, LLC. (Ward, Joseph)
June 19, 2019 Filing 29 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Dacqui D. Archer, Jr All parties do not consent.. (Robinson, Jennifer)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference for 7/9/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 7/2/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/17/2019. (ksena)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default. The 10 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendants Akima, LLC and Five Rivers Services, LLC is SET ASIDE. The #21 Motion to Set Aside is denied as moot. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/17/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
June 17, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/17/19 regarding #25 Stipulated MOTION to Set Aside 10 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Dacqui D. Archer, Jr. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
June 14, 2019 Filing 25 Stipulated MOTION to Set Aside 10 Clerk's Entry of Default by Plaintiff Dacqui D. Archer, Jr. (Robinson, Jennifer)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a response to #21 no later than 6/14/2019 and Defendants shall file a reply no later than 6/21/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/3/2019. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2)
June 3, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing Declaration in Support of Rule 55(C) Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default by Defendants Akima, LLC, Five Rivers Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Ward, Joseph)
May 31, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/31/19 regarding #21 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Five Rivers Services, LLC, Akima, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
May 31, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Defendants Akima, LLC, Five Rivers Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Ward, Joseph)
May 29, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Samuel Zurik, III on behalf of Akima, LLC, Five Rivers Services, LLCAttorney Samuel Zurik, III added to party Akima, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel Zurik, III added to party Five Rivers Services, LLC(pty:dft) (Zurik, Samuel)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER denying #17 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default. Defendants failed to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(a) & (d). Any renewed motion shall contain the proper conferral and Defendants' entire argument and attach any affidavits to the motion pursuant to the Court's electronic filing procedures. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/28/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/28/19 regarding #17 MOTION to Set Aside 10 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Five Rivers Services, LLC, Akima, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Set Aside 10 Clerk's Entry of Default by Defendants Akima, LLC, Five Rivers Services, LLC. (Ward, Joseph)
May 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Richard Ward, III on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Joseph Richard Ward, III added to party Akima, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Richard Ward, III added to party Five Rivers Services, LLC(pty:dft) (Ward, Joseph)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to his request in the #7 Motion for Entry of Default, Plaintiff may file a proper motion for default judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b)(2) no later than June 17, 2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/21/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING MOTION(S): #7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Akima, LLC and Five Rivers Services, LLC filed by Dacqui D. Archer, Jr. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/21/2019. Text Only Entry (reblc2)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2019 is VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/20/19. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/20/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to 10 Clerk's Entry of Default. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01025-REB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 SET ASIDE Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Akima, LLC, Five Rivers Services, LLC re #9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Akima, LLC and Five Rivers Services, LLC, by Clerk. Text Only Entry (jgonz, ) Modified on 6/17/2019 pursuant to Order #27 (jgonz, ).
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Akima, LLC and Five Rivers Services, LLC by Plaintiff Dacqui D. Archer, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jennifer Robinson, Esq., #2 Affidavit Return of Service, #3 Affidavit Return of Service)(Robinson, Jennifer)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTE REGARDING DEFAULT - Default will not be entered as to Akima, LLC, Five Rivers Services, LLC re #7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Akima, LLC and Five Rivers Services, LLC as: the affidavit or declaration required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a) was not filed as an attachment to request for Clerk's entry of default, by Clerk. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Akima, LLC and Five Rivers Services, LLC by Plaintiff Dacqui D. Archer, Jr. (Robinson, Jennifer) Modified on 5/20/2019 to reactivate the motion (agarc, ).
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dacqui D. Archer, Jr. (Robinson, Jennifer)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dacqui D. Archer, Jr. Akima, LLC served on 4/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019; Five Rivers Services, LLC served on 4/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Robinson, Jennifer)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 5/28/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/09/2019. (ksena)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (rvill, )
April 6, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
April 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Akima, LLC, Five Rivers Services, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6622302)Attorney Jennifer C. Robinson added to party Dacqui D. Archer, Jr(pty:pla), filed by Dacqui D. Archer, Jr.(Robinson, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Archer v. Akima, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dacqui D. Archer, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer C. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Rivers Services, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Richard Ward, III
Represented By: Samuel Zurik, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akima, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Richard Ward, III
Represented By: Samuel Zurik, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?