Gitlitz et al v. USA

Plaintiff: Louise Gitlitz and David Gitlitz
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01041
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
2 Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re: #18 Notice of Motion to Consolidate Cases and the Joint 15 Motion to Consolidate Related Cases in 19-cv-00714 CMA-MEH. This action is consolidated with, Civil Action No. 1:19-cv-00714 CMA-MEH, solely for the purpose of addressing issues involving 26 U.S.C. 103. Any issues in each case that do not involve application of 26 U.S.C. 103 shall remain separate and shall not be part of the consolidated action. All filings relating to pretrial discovery shall be filed in case 19-cv-00714 CMA-MEH and shall utilize the consolidated case caption that appears in this order. Filings unrelated to pretrial discovery matters shall be made using the individual case captions and shall be filed in the appropriate case, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/20/2019. (evana, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by USA.(Butler, Charles)
June 3, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate Cases by Defendant USA (Butler, Charles)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Scheduling Conference which had been set for 6/27/2019 at 9:30 AM with Magistrate Judge Varholak is hereby vacated; and is now re-set for 7/30/2019 09:30 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. A Scheduling Conference is set in GRAND JUNCTION, Colorado at the Wayne Aspinall Federal Building - United States Courthouse, 400 Rood Avenue, Grand Junction, CO 81501 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. The parties shall comply with the Instructions to Scheduling Order for U.S. Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher which can be found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Parties concerned regarding travel time and expense to Grand Junction for appearances before the Magistrate Judge are referred to this Magistrate Judge's policy in that regard which can be found at the above website. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on May 24, 2019. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER reassigning this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as thereferral judge. All further filings in this case shall reflect the case number of 19-cv-01041-RM-GPG. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/24/2019. (cpear)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/21/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/21/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent pursuant to #12 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01041-RM. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs David Gitlitz, Louise Gitlitz All parties do not consent.. (Colvin, John)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Charles J. Butler on behalf of USAAttorney Charles J. Butler added to party USA(pty:dft) (Butler, Charles)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER. In light of #9 Notice (Other), the parties shall file the Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form on or before 5/22/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/8/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case by Plaintiffs David Gitlitz, Louise Gitlitz (Colvin, John)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) USA served on 4/15/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Colvin, John)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/27/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 6/13/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/10/2019. (jgonz, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #4 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01041-STV. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6625756)Attorney John Mark Colvin added to party David Gitlitz(pty:pla), Attorney John Mark Colvin added to party Louise Gitlitz(pty:pla), filed by David Gitlitz, Louise Gitlitz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Colvin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gitlitz et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Gitlitz
Represented By: Cory Lyn Johnson
Represented By: John Mark Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gitlitz
Represented By: Cory Lyn Johnson
Represented By: John Mark Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Charles J. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?