Cruz v. Safeco Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: Diana Cruz
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv01078
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a four-day Jury Trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on June 1, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for May 6, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/11/19. (rbjsec. )
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/11/19. (jdyne, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Scheduling Conference held on 6/11/2019. Discovery due by 1/13/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 2/13/2020. Four day Jury Trial set to commence 6/1/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson with a Trial Preparation Conference on 5/6/2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. Court Reporter: Sarah Mitchell. (jdyne, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Diana Cruz All parties do not consent.. (Roth, David)
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Diana Cruz. (Roth, David)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: A Scheduling Conference is set for 6/11/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/22/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Holly C. White on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Holly C. White added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (White, Holly)
May 3, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Attorney Brian John Spano added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) by Safeco Insurance Company of America.(Spano, Brian)
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #9 Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information filed by attorney David Roth. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (evana, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by David Martin Roth (Roth, David)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/17/19. (rbjsec.)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Diana Cruz. (Roth, David)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #5 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01078-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Safeco Insurance Company of America re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Diana Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roth, David)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diana Cruz (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6631901)Attorney David Martin Roth added to party Diana Cruz(pty:pla), filed by Diana Cruz.(Roth, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Brian John Spano
Represented By: Holly C. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Cruz
Represented By: David Martin Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?