PopSockets LLC v. Wilcox
Plaintiff: PopSockets LLC
Defendant: Lora Suzanne Wilcox and Bradley James Wilcox
Case Number: 1:2019cv01080
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 40 AMENDED REPLY to Response to #15 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Bradley James Wilcox, Lora Suzanne Wilcox. (cthom, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE to #31 MOTION to Stay DISCOVERY AND STAY FURTHER PROCEEDINGS filed by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13)(Groves, Matthew)
June 27, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities IN SUPPORT OFPLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION re: #27 Response to Motion, #15 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum Decision and Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Groves, Matthew)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER re: #34 Reply to Response to #15 Motion to Dismiss filed by Lora Suzanne Wilcox, Bradley James Wilcox, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/26/2019. This reply is STRICKEN. (tsher, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Lora Suzanne Wilcox by Defendants Bradley James Wilcox, Lora Suzanne Wilcox. (cthom, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Bradley James Wilcox by Defendants Bradley James Wilcox, Lora Suzanne Wilcox. (cthom, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 34 STRICKEN REPLY to Response to #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Bradley James Wilcox, Lora Suzanne Wilcox. (cthom, ) Modified on 6/26/2019 pursuant to #37 Minute Order (tsher, ).
June 20, 2019 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM regarding #31 MOTION to Stay filed by Lora Suzanne Wilcox, Bradley James Wilcox. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/20/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
June 20, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of "Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedures 26(a)1" by Defendants Bradley James Wilcox, Lora Suzanne Wilcox. (cthom, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Stay Further Proceedings Pending Resolution and Ruling on Defendants Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Bradley James Wilcox, Lora Suzanne Wilcox. (cthom, )
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/13/2019. (tsher, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/13/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: MEH Courtroom A501. (lgale, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PopSockets LLC. Bradley James Wilcox served on 5/8/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. (Groves, Matthew)
June 10, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (ECF No. 15) filed by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC. (Groves, Matthew)
June 6, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, by Bradley James Wilcox, Lora Suzanne Wilcox.(cthom, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 25 Proposed Scheduling Order Submited by Plaintiff by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC. (Groves, Matthew)
June 5, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William D. Kloss on behalf of PopSockets LLCAttorney William D. Kloss added to party PopSockets LLC(pty:pla) (Kloss, William)
June 5, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rajeev Kumar Adlakha on behalf of PopSockets LLCAttorney Rajeev Kumar Adlakha added to party PopSockets LLC(pty:pla) (Adlakha, Rajeev)
June 5, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daren Scott Garcia on behalf of PopSockets LLCAttorney Daren Scott Garcia added to party PopSockets LLC(pty:pla) (Garcia, Daren)
May 30, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM regarding #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lora Suzanne Wilcox, Bradley James Wilcox. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/30/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/30/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/30/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
May 29, 2019 Filing 18 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01080-RM. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER re: #16 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by PopSockets LLC by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/29/2019. Parties do not consent. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). (tsher, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC All parties do not consent.. (Groves, Matthew)
May 17, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, by Defendants Bradley James Wilcox, Lora Suzanne Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tsher, )
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/9/2019. Bradley James Wilcox answer due 6/7/2019; Lora Suzanne Wilcox answer due 6/7/2019. (tsher, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, by Defendants Bradley James Wilcox, Lora Suzanne Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tsher, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tsher, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PopSockets LLC. Lora Suzanne Wilcox served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. (Groves, Matthew)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Bradley James Wilcox re #8 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC. (Groves, Matthew)
May 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #8 Amended Complaint, NOTICE OF AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint showing revisions pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1)(Groves, Matthew)
May 4, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, INJUNCTIVE AND OTHER RELIEF FOR VIOLATIONS OF 15 U.S.C. 1114; 15 U.S.C. 1125; C.R.S. 6-1-105; TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE; AND RELATED CLAIMS; AND JURY DEMAND against Lora Suzanne Wilcox, Bradley James Wilcox, filed by PopSockets LLC.(Groves, Matthew)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/15/2019. Consent Form due by 5/30/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 6/13/2019 11:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (rroge, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Groves, Matthew)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Lora Suzanne Wilcox by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC. (Groves, Matthew)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, INJUNCTIVE AND OTHER RELIEF against Lora Suzanne Wilcox (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6632096), filed by PopSockets LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Groves, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PopSockets LLC v. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lora Suzanne Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley James Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PopSockets LLC
Represented By: Matthew Ray Groves
Represented By: Rajeev Kumar Adlakha
Represented By: Daren Scott Garcia
Represented By: William D. Kloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?