Rangitsch v. Doran

Plaintiff: William Rangitsch
Defendant: Steven Doran
Case Number: 1:2019cv01081
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service Subpoena to Attend Deposition to Dr. Laura Sehnert and Waiver of Service of same by Defendant Steven Doran. (Milstein, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #11 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/13/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CIVIL PRACTICE AND TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. ISSUED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/11/2019. (skclc2)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/10/19. (amont, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews: Scheduling Conference held on 6/10/2019. Discovery due by 11/15/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/16/2019. Joint Status Report due by 8/26/2019. Final Pretrial and Trial Preparation Conference set for 3/2/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. A three (3) day Jury Trial is set to commence on 5/4/2020 08:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (amont, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff William Rangitsch. (Hammond, Kristopher)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff William Rangitsch All parties consent.. (Hammond, Kristopher)
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Jury Demand by Steven Doran.(Milstein, Michael)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 6/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 6/3/2019. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #7 ) is due 6/3/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/15/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kristopher Hammond on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kristopher Hammond added to party William Rangitsch(pty:pla) (Hammond, Kristopher)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Steven Doran, filed by William Rangitsch.(rvill, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Grahame Milstein on behalf of Steven Doran (Milstein, Michael)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal, of Filing of State Court Records Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 by Defendant Steven Doran (Milstein, Michael)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Steven Doran from Routt County District Court, Case Number 2019CV30026. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6632118), filed by Steven Doran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (State Court Summons), #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint and Coversheet), #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal (State Court Waiver and Acceptance of Service), #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Milstein, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rangitsch v. Doran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Rangitsch
Represented By: Kristopher Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Doran
Represented By: Michael Grahame Milstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?