Chorney v. Colorado School of Mines et al

Plaintiff: Catherine Chorney
Defendant: Karen Abt, John Does 1-10, individually and as agents of Colorado School of Mines, Dr. Colin A. Terry, Colorado School of Mines, John G. Speer, Dr. Thomas M. Boyd, Colin (I) A. Terry, Thomas (I) M. Boyd, Colin A. Terry, Thomas M. Boyd, John (I) G. Speer and Karen (I) Abt
Case Number: 1:2019cv01083
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441ada
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Stay for 60 Days and to stay Discovery for 60 Days by Plaintiff Catherine Chorney. (Opp, Kevin)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #19 Defendants' Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Court finds the requirements of D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(b) have been met. Therefore, the Motion is GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that Attorney Kimberly Ann Sorrells is terminated as counsel for all Defendants. The Court notes that Defendants continue to be represented by Attorneys Jacquelynn Rich Fredericks and Cara Morlan. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall cancel future ECF filing notifications to Ms. Kimberly Ann Sorrells. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/14/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
May 13, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Karen Abt, Karen (I) Abt, Thomas M. Boyd, Thomas (I) M. Boyd, Colorado School of Mines, John G. Speer, John (I) G. Speer, Colin A. Terry, Colin (I) A. Terry. (Rich Fredericks, Jacquelynn)
May 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Kevin Opp ESQ with Cohen LLC by Kevin Lee Opp on behalf of Catherine ChorneyAttorney Kevin Lee Opp added to party Catherine Chorney(pty:pla) (Opp, Kevin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Attorney Kevin Opp by Anthony Aaron Garcia on behalf of Catherine Chorney (Garcia, Anthony)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE Re: #15 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Counsel. Attorney Kimberly S. Sorrells Withdrawal is INEFFECTIVE for a failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(b). "An attorney who has filed an Entry of Appearance or an Entry of Appearance to Provide Limited Representation or has appeared otherwise in a case may seek to withdraw on motion showing good cause." D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(b) (stating requirements of a motion to withdrawal as counsel). IT IS ORDERED that Ms. Sorrells remains responsible for all deadlines, filings, and other obligations as an attorney of record for Defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Ms. Sorrells is granted leave seek withdrawal in accordance with the requirements of Local Attorney Rule 5(b). SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/9/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
May 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Counsel by Defendants Karen Abt, Karen (I) Abt, Thomas M. Boyd, Thomas (I) M. Boyd, Colorado School of Mines, John G. Speer, John (I) G. Speer, Colin A. Terry, Colin (I) A. Terry (Sorrells, Kimberly)
May 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cara Jenine Morlan on behalf of Karen Abt, Karen (I) Abt, Thomas M. Boyd, Thomas (I) M. Boyd, Colorado School of Mines, John G. Speer, John (I) G. Speer, Colin A. Terry, Colin (I) A. TerryAttorney Cara Jenine Morlan added to party Karen Abt(pty:dft), Attorney Cara Jenine Morlan added to party Karen (I) Abt(pty:dft), Attorney Cara Jenine Morlan added to party Thomas M. Boyd(pty:dft), Attorney Cara Jenine Morlan added to party Thomas (I) M. Boyd(pty:dft), Attorney Cara Jenine Morlan added to party Colorado School of Mines(pty:dft), Attorney Cara Jenine Morlan added to party John G. Speer(pty:dft), Attorney Cara Jenine Morlan added to party John (I) G. Speer(pty:dft), Attorney Cara Jenine Morlan added to party Colin A. Terry(pty:dft), Attorney Cara Jenine Morlan added to party Colin (I) A. Terry(pty:dft) (Morlan, Cara)
May 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anthony Aaron Garcia on behalf of Catherine ChorneyAttorney Anthony Aaron Garcia added to party Catherine Chorney(pty:pla) (Garcia, Anthony)
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey Cohen on behalf of Catherine ChorneyAttorney Jeffrey Cohen added to party Catherine Chorney(pty:pla) (Cohen, Jeffrey)
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jacquelynn Nichole Rich Fredericks on behalf of Karen Abt, Karen (I) Abt, Thomas M. Boyd, Thomas (I) M. Boyd, Colorado School of Mines, John G. Speer, John (I) G. Speer, Colin A. Terry, Colin (I) A. Terry (Rich Fredericks, Jacquelynn)
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Karen Abt, Karen (I) Abt, Thomas M. Boyd, Thomas (I) M. Boyd, Colorado School of Mines, John G. Speer, John (I) G. Speer, Colin A. Terry, Colin (I) A. Terry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rich Fredericks, Jacquelynn)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond For good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. All named Defendants shall have until 5/3/2019 to file a Answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint (ECF. #4 ). SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/18/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #4 Complaint by Defendants Karen Abt, Karen (I) Abt, Thomas M. Boyd, Thomas (I) M. Boyd, Colorado School of Mines, John G. Speer, John (I) G. Speer, Colin A. Terry, Colin (I) A. Terry. (Sorrells, Kimberly)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kimberly Ann Sorrells on behalf of Karen Abt, Karen (I) Abt, Thomas M. Boyd, Thomas (I) M. Boyd, Colorado School of Mines, John G. Speer, John (I) G. Speer, Colin A. Terry, Colin (I) A. Terry (Sorrells, Kimberly)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Karen Abt, Karen (I) Abt, Thomas M. Boyd, Thomas (I) M. Boyd, Colorado School of Mines, John G. Speer, John (I) G. Speer, Colin A. Terry, Colin (I) A. Terry, filed by Catherine Chorney.(rvill, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT RECORDS from Exhibits to Complaint by Defendants Karen Abt, Thomas M. Boyd, Colorado School of Mines, John G. Speer, Colin A. Terry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 to State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 to State Court Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 to State Court Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 to State Court Complaint pt 1, #7 Exhibit 6 to State Court Complaint pt 2, #8 Exhibit 6 to State Court Complaint pt 3, #9 Exhibit 7 to State Court Complaint, #10 Exhibit 8 to State Court Complaint, #11 Exhibit 9 to State Court Complaint, #12 Exhibit 10 to State Court Complaint, #13 Exhibit 11 to State Court Complaint, #14 Exhibit 12 to State Court Complaint, #15 Exhibit 13 to State Court Complaint, #16 Exhibit 14 to State Court Complaint, #17 Exhibit 16 to State Court Complaint, #18 Exhibit 17 to State Court Complaint, #19 Exhibit 18 to State Court Complaint, #20 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sorrells, Kimberly)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Thomas M. Boyd, John G. Speer, Colin A. Terry, Colorado School of Mines, Karen Abt from District Court, City and County of Denver, Case Number 2019cv30760. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6632341), filed by Thomas M. Boyd, John G. Speer, Colin A. Terry, Colorado School of Mines, Karen Abt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-1 State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-2 State Court Summons, #4 Exhibit A-3 State Court Waiver & Acceptance, #5 Exhibit A-4 State Court Delay Reduct. Order, #6 Exhibit B - State Court Docket Sheet)(Sorrells, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chorney v. Colorado School of Mines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Abt
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Sorrells
Represented By: Jacquelynn Nichole Rich Fredericks
Represented By: Cara Jenine Morlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10, individually and as agents of Colorado School of Mines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Colin A. Terry
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Sorrells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado School of Mines
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Sorrells
Represented By: Jacquelynn Nichole Rich Fredericks
Represented By: Cara Jenine Morlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G. Speer
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Sorrells
Represented By: Jacquelynn Nichole Rich Fredericks
Represented By: Cara Jenine Morlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Thomas M. Boyd
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Sorrells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin (I) A. Terry
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Sorrells
Represented By: Jacquelynn Nichole Rich Fredericks
Represented By: Cara Jenine Morlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas (I) M. Boyd
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Sorrells
Represented By: Jacquelynn Nichole Rich Fredericks
Represented By: Cara Jenine Morlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin A. Terry
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Sorrells
Represented By: Jacquelynn Nichole Rich Fredericks
Represented By: Cara Jenine Morlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas M. Boyd
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Sorrells
Represented By: Jacquelynn Nichole Rich Fredericks
Represented By: Cara Jenine Morlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John (I) G. Speer
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Sorrells
Represented By: Jacquelynn Nichole Rich Fredericks
Represented By: Cara Jenine Morlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen (I) Abt
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Sorrells
Represented By: Jacquelynn Nichole Rich Fredericks
Represented By: Cara Jenine Morlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Chorney
Represented By: Anthony Aaron Garcia
Represented By: Jeffrey Cohen
Represented By: Kevin Lee Opp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?