Hook et al v. LNV Corporation

Plaintiff: David L. Smith and M. Julia Hook
Defendant: LNV Corporation
Interested Party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Case Number: 1:2019cv01097
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #13 "Plaintiffs' Motion to Disqualify United States District Judge Raymond P. Moore; Request to Transfer Motion to the Chief Judge of the United States District Court for the District of Colorado for Hearing and Determination; Request for Stay of Proceedings Pending Resolution of Motion" by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/21/19.(dkals, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Disqualify "United States District Judge Raymond P. Moore; Request to Transfer Motion to the Chief Judge of the United States District Court for the District of Colorado for Hearing and Determination; Request for Stay of Proceedings Pending Resolution of Motion" by Plaintiffs M. Julia Hook, David L. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cthom, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO #10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiffs M. Julia Hook, David L. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(cthom, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #10 by Defendant LNV CorporationAttorney Julie Andrea Trent added to party LNV Corporation(pty:dft). (Trent, Julie)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE On or before Monday, May 13, 2019, the parties shall SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed based on (a) improper claim splitting; (b) claim and/or issue preclusion due to the Court's rulings and orders in Hook I; and (c) the same rationale and bases as the numerous orders entered by the Court in Hook I which are directed to the same allegations and claims raised in Hook II. ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/22/2019. (cthom, )
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Granting LNV Corporation's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond from Adversary No. 18-1250-TBM filed by Clerk pursuant to ecf 7 Minute Order. (cthom, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 Complaint and Jury Demand from Adversary No. 18-1250-TBM filed by Clerk pursuant to ecf 7 Minute Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cthom, )
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court upon review of the docket in Adversary Proceeding 18-1250-TBM. Upon such review, the Clerk is directed to request the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court to transfer copies of the following docket entries filed in the Adversary Proceeding, for filing in this Court: ECF No. 1 and No. 10. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/16/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8 April 2019. (cmadr, )
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4 April 2019. (cmadr, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE to Defendants' #2 MOTION to Strike, for Sanctions and for Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff LNV Corporation. (cmadr, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Defendants' MOTION to Strike, for Sanctions and for Order to Show Cause by Defendants M. Julia Hook, David L. Smith. (cmadr, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Enjoin Further Pro Se Pleadings or, in the Alternative, to Withdraw the Reference or Stay Adversary Proceeding by Plaintiff LNV Corporation. (cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hook et al v. LNV Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. Julia Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LNV Corporation
Represented By: Duncan Eugene Barber
Represented By: Julie Andrea Trent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?