Brown et al v. McDermott et al

Plaintiff: Angela Brown and Keith Penny
Defendant: Andrew McDermott and City of Aurora, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv01108
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331vc
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/25/19 regarding #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Aurora, The. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant City of Aurora, The. (Evans, Isabelle)
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Andrew McDermott.(Smith, Ann)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/12/19. All motions concerning the testimony of expert witnesses raising issues under Fed. R. Evid. 401, 702, 703, 704, or 705 as codified and construed shall be filed by February 10, 2020. A combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference is set 6/18/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Four Day Jury Trial is set 7/6/2020 through 7/9/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/11/2019. (bwilk, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 6/11/2019 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Discovery due by 2/11/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/12/2020. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (bwilk, )
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/11/2019. (bwilk, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Scheduling Order and Protective Order by Plaintiffs Angela Brown, Keith Penny. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Protective Order)(Bryant, Raymond)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang.IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/30/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #8 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01108-REB. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Angela Brown, Keith Penny All parties do not consent.. (Bryant, Raymond)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ann Baumgartner Smith on behalf of Andrew McDermottAttorney Ann Baumgartner Smith added to party Andrew McDermott(pty:dft) (Smith, Ann)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Peter Ruben Morales on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party City of Aurora, The(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party Andrew McDermott(pty:dft) (Morales, Peter)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Isabelle Sabra Evans on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Isabelle Sabra Evans added to party City of Aurora, The(pty:dft), Attorney Isabelle Sabra Evans added to party Andrew McDermott(pty:dft) (Evans, Isabelle)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 04/18/19 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 5/28/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 6/11/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against City of Aurora, Colorado, Andrew Mcdermott (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6635801)Attorney Raymond K. Bryant added to party Angela Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Raymond K. Bryant added to party Keith Penny(pty:pla), filed by Angela Brown, Keith Penny. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons McDermott, #3 Summons Aurora)(Bryant, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. McDermott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew McDermott
Represented By: Isabelle Sabra Evans
Represented By: Ann Baumgartner Smith
Represented By: Peter Ruben Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Aurora, The
Represented By: Isabelle Sabra Evans
Represented By: Peter Ruben Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Brown
Represented By: Raymond K. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Penny
Represented By: Raymond K. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?