Restoration Hardware, Inc. et al v. Birdsall & Co.

Plaintiff: RH US, LLC and Restoration Hardware, Inc.
Defendant: Birdsall & Co.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01116
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Restoration Hardware, Inc., RH US, LLC. Birdsall & Co. served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (McCue, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/6/2019. Consent Form due by 7/3/2019. Scheduling Conference is VACATED and RESET to 7/18/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Aaron D. Johnson on behalf of RH US, LLC, Restoration Hardware, Inc.Attorney Aaron D. Johnson added to party RH US, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Aaron D. Johnson added to party Restoration Hardware, Inc.(pty:pla) (Johnson, Aaron)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael J. McCue on behalf of RH US, LLC, Restoration Hardware, Inc.Attorney Michael J. McCue added to party RH US, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Michael J. McCue added to party Restoration Hardware, Inc.(pty:pla) (McCue, Michael)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/16/2019. Consent Form due by 5/29/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 6/12/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (rroge, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Birdsall & Co. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6637505)Attorney Hermine Kallman added to party RH US, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Hermine Kallman added to party Restoration Hardware, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Restoration Hardware, Inc., RH US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Kallman, Hermine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Restoration Hardware, Inc. et al v. Birdsall & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RH US, LLC
Represented By: Hermine Kallman
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Aaron D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Restoration Hardware, Inc.
Represented By: Hermine Kallman
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Aaron D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birdsall & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?