Hsu v. Cobham Colorado Springs Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ethan Hsu
Defendant: Cobham Colorado Springs Inc. and Sandy Deale
Case Number: 1:2019cv01148
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: FMLA
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the #16 notice of dismissal filed in this case. Text Only Entry. (cthom, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A) by Plaintiff Ethan Hsu (Swan, Andrew)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: Based on the #14 Notice of Resolution, the Scheduling Conference set for June 17, 2019 is VACATED. The parties shall file appropriate dismissal documents no later than June 21, 2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/7/19. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE Joint Notice of Resolution by Plaintiff Ethan Hsu (Swan, Andrew)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/4/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/4/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-1148-RM. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Ethan Hsu All parties do not consent.. (Swan, Andrew)
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas William Carroll on behalf of Cobham Colorado Springs Inc., Sandy DealeAttorney Thomas William Carroll added to party Cobham Colorado Springs Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas William Carroll added to party Sandy Deale(pty:dft) (Carroll, Thomas)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Erin Ashley Webber on behalf of Cobham Colorado Springs Inc., Sandy DealeAttorney Erin Ashley Webber added to party Cobham Colorado Springs Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Ashley Webber added to party Sandy Deale(pty:dft) (Webber, Erin)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Dickson Kuhn on behalf of Ethan HsuAttorney Michael Dickson Kuhn added to party Ethan Hsu(pty:pla) (Kuhn, Michael)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul Forrest Lewis on behalf of Ethan HsuAttorney Paul Forrest Lewis added to party Ethan Hsu(pty:pla) (Lewis, Paul)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ethan Hsu. Cobham Colorado Springs Inc. waiver sent on 4/18/2019, answer due 6/17/2019; Sandy Deale waiver sent on 4/18/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Swan, Andrew)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/17/2019 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 6/10/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/24/2019. (ksena)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cobham Colorado Springs Inc., Sandy Deale (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6642629)Attorney Andrew Edward Swan added to party Ethan Hsu(pty:pla), filed by Ethan Hsu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons on Cobham Colorado Springs Inc., #3 Summons Summons on Sandy Deale)(Swan, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hsu v. Cobham Colorado Springs Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobham Colorado Springs Inc.
Represented By: Erin Ashley Webber
Represented By: Thomas William Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Deale
Represented By: Erin Ashley Webber
Represented By: Thomas William Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan Hsu
Represented By: Andrew Edward Swan
Represented By: Michael Dickson Kuhn
Represented By: Paul Forrest Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?