Marzella v. Bohle

Plaintiff: Kari Marzella
Defendant: Daniel J Bohle
Case Number: 1:2019cv01197
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: James M Candelaria
Referring Judge: John L Kane
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge James M Candelaria on 7/2/19 GRANTING #17 Unopposed Motion for Telephonic Appearance at Scheduling Conference, by Defendant's Counsel Attorney Karin B. Williamson.(nmarb, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM regarding #17 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically for Scheduling Conference filed by Daniel J Bohle. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge James M Candelaria by Judge John L. Kane on 7/2/2019. Text Only Entry (jlksec)
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically for Scheduling Conference by Defendant Daniel J Bohle. (Williamson, Karin)
May 8, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Daniel J Bohle All parties do not consent.. (Michalek, Steven)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge James M Candelaria on 5/7/19, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 7/24/2019 04:00 PM in Courtroom 150 (Durango) before Magistrate Judge James M Candelaria. (nmarb, )
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge James M Candelaria on 5/3/19 GRANTING #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Designation of a Nonparty Pursuant to C.R.S. 13-21-111.5(3). Dr. Bohle shall have up to and including July 29, 2019 to file a designation of nonparties. (nmarb, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Designation of a Nonparty Pursuant to CRS 13-21-111.5(3) by Defendant Daniel J Bohle. (Michalek, Steven)
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #3 Complaint and Jury Demand by Daniel J Bohle.(Michalek, Steven)
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Benjamin Michael Wegener on behalf of Kari MarzellaAttorney Benjamin Michael Wegener added to party Kari Marzella(pty:pla) (Wegener, Benjamin)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE This civil action is referred to Magistrate Judge James M Candelaria for all purposes up to and including the pretrial order. Trial will be held in Durango, Colorado. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 4/26/2019. (cthom, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Karin Bassa Williamson on behalf of Daniel J BohleAttorney Karin Bassa Williamson added to party Daniel J Bohle(pty:dft) (Williamson, Karin)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Judge John L. Kane and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT ORDER re: Plaintiff's Second Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Serve Complaint signed by a Montezuma County District Court Judge. (cmadr, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Motion for Enlargement of Time to Serve Complaint, Order Granting Enlargement of Time upon Daniel J. Bohle on March 27, 2019. (cmadr, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT ORDER re: Plaintiff's Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Serve Complaint signed by Montezuma District Court Judge Todd Plewe. (cmadr, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Daniel J Bohle, filed by Kari Marzella.(cmadr, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Daniel J Bohle from District Court Montezuma County, Colorado, Case Number 2018CV30104. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6650870), filed by Daniel J Bohle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Michalek, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marzella v. Bohle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J Bohle
Represented By: Steven Anthony Michalek
Represented By: Karin Bassa Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kari Marzella
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Wegener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?