Kim v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Yeon Sik Kim
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht, Kevin McAleenan, Angela K. Goldinger and Lee F. Cissna
Case Number: 1:2019cv01212
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Lee F. Cissna served on 5/8/2019, answer due 7/8/2019; Angela K. Goldinger served on 5/9/2019, answer due 7/8/2019; Andrew Lambrecht served on 5/8/2019, answer due 7/8/2019; Kevin McAleenan served on 5/8/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Casey, Jennifer)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #4 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01212-SKC. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LEE CISSNA, ANGELA Kristi GOLDINGER, ANDREW LAMBRECHT, Kevin MCALEENAN (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6652725) Attorney David Lawrence Kolko added to party Yeon Sik KIM(pty:pla), filed by Yeon Sik KIM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Summons Request McAleenan, #9 Summons Request Cissna, #10 Summons Request Goldinger, #11 Summons Request Lambrecht, #12 Summons Request Barr, #13 Summons Request Dunn)(Kolko, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yeon Sik Kim
Represented By: David Lawrence Kolko
Represented By: Jennifer Rilen Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela K. Goldinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee F. Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?