Ahmadabadi v. Lambrecht et al
Plaintiff: Farid Shekarchian Ahmadabadi
Defendant: Robert Cowan, Andrew Lambrecht, Kevin K McAleenan, William Barr and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 1:2019cv01215
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/1/19 GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. William Barr answer due 7/31/2019; L. Francis Cissna answer due 7/31/2019; Robert Cowan answer due 7/31/2019; Andrew Lambrecht answer due 7/31/2019; Kevin K McAleenan answer due 7/31/2019.(nmarb, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants William Barr, L. Francis Cissna, Robert Cowan, Andrew Lambrecht, Kevin K McAleenan. (Dickey, Lauren)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/29/19. Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (lgale, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #1 Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint, and #5 Certificate of Mailing/Service, filed by attorney Mohammad Kalani. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
April 28, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service by Plaintiff Farid Shekarchian Ahmadabadi. (Kalani, Mohammad)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Farid Shekarchian Ahmadabadi. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Kalani, Mohammad)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. The summons submitted is incomplete and not issued. All parties must be listed on the caption and a summons that is addressed to multiple defendants, must be issued for each defendant to be served. (rvill, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6653476)Attorney Mohammad Kalani added to party Farid Shekarchian Ahmadabadi(pty:pla), filed by Farid Shekarchian Ahmadabadi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Exhibit I-485 Receipt, #4 Exhibit I-130 Receipt, #5 Exhibit Processing time)(Kalani, Mohammad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmadabadi v. Lambrecht et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farid Shekarchian Ahmadabadi
Represented By: Mohammad Kalani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Cowan
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K McAleenan
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?