Pringle v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Laurie Pringle
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: USAO-SS-Noticing and SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2019cv01225
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Marcia S Krieger
Nature of Suit: Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN ORDER: SS Plaintiff's Opening Brief due by 8/6/2019. SS Defendant's Response Brief due by 8/27/2019. SS Plaintiff's Reply Brief due by 9/10/2019. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/3/2019. (wydlc2, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Laurie Pringle All parties do not consent.. (Abbott, Teresa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed Joint Case Management Plan by Plaintiff Laurie Pringle. (Abbott, Teresa)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document, #3 Continuation of Main Document, #4 Continuation of Main Document, #5 Continuation of Main Document, #6 Continuation of Main Document, #7 Continuation of Main Document, #8 Continuation of Main Document, #9 Continuation of Main Document, #10 Continuation of Main Document, #11 Continuation of Main Document, #12 Continuation of Main Document, #13 Continuation of Main Document, #14 Continuation of Main Document, #15 Continuation of Main Document, #16 Continuation of Main Document, #17 Continuation of Main Document, #18 Continuation of Main Document, #19 Continuation of Main Document)(Valerio, Christina)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christina J. Valerio on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney Christina J. Valerio added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Valerio, Christina)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Benedict Garcia on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney J. Benedict Garcia added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Garcia, J.)
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(e) and General Order 2019-2, this case has been reassigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger effective this date. All future pleadings should be designated 19-cv-1225-MSK. Text only entry. (cthom, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED. Upon the passing of Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(e), this case has been reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn effective this date. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01225-REB. (Text only entry). (rvill, )
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Joint Case Management Plan). (sphil, )
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/29/2019.(sphil, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 8 Utility Setting Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 6/25/2019. Text Only Entry (evana, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry). (rsams, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rsams, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Teresa H. Abbott on behalf of Laurie Frances PringleAttorney Teresa H. Abbott added to party Laurie Frances Pringle(pty:pla) (Abbott, Teresa)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Laurie Frances Pringle. (Feldman, Thomas)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (rroge, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Petition for Review against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, SSA Noticing Attorney Thomas Andrew Feldman added to party Laurie Frances Pringle(pty:pla), filed by Laurie Frances Pringle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit)(Feldman, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pringle v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Pringle
Represented By: Teresa H. Abbott
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: Christina J. Valerio
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?