Lapier v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Scott Lapier
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: USAO-SS-Noticing and SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2019cv01237
Filed: April 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Marcia S Krieger
Nature of Suit: Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document, #3 Continuation of Main Document, #4 Continuation of Main Document, #5 Continuation of Main Document, #6 Continuation of Main Document, #7 Continuation of Main Document, #8 Continuation of Main Document, #9 Continuation of Main Document, #10 Continuation of Main Document, #11 Continuation of Main Document, #12 Continuation of Main Document)(Webber, Narissa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Narissa C. Webber on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney Narissa C. Webber added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Webber, Narissa)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Benedict Garcia on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney J. Benedict Garcia added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Garcia, J.)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(e) and General Order 2019-2, this case has been reassigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger effective this date. All future pleadings should be designated 19-cv-1237-MSK. Text only entry. (cthom, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED. Upon the passing of Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(e), this case has been reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn effective this date. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01237-REB. (Text only entry). (rvill, )
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Joint Case Management Plan) (sphil, )
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/29/2019.(sphil, )
April 28, 2019 Filing 6 Utility Setting Answer Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 6/27/2019. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
April 28, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff SCOTT LAPIER. (Abbott, Teresa)
April 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND PETITION FOR REVIEW against NANCY A. BERRYHILL Attorney Teresa H. Abbott added to party SCOTT LAPIER(pty:pla), filed by SCOTT LAPIER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Abbott, Teresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lapier v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: Narissa C. Webber
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Lapier
Represented By: Teresa H. Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?