Stricklin v. Bordelon et al
Plaintiff: Walter Stricklin
Defendant: Brock Bordelon, John Williams, Jr, Matthew Burkholder, Sarah Meyer, Nicole Mason, Colorado Health Initiatives, Barbara Carris and Catholic Health Initiatives Colorado
Case Number: 1:2019cv01242
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/24/2019. (ksena)
June 24, 2019 Filing 23 COURTROOM MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Scheduling Conference held on 6/24/2019, ( Discovery due by 4/13/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 5/13/2020., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/13/2020., Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya.). FTR: courtroom 101. (ksena) (Main Document 23 replaced on 6/26/2019) (ksena, ).
June 19, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Matthew George, Esq. by Matthew Whelen George on behalf of Matthew BurkholderAttorney Matthew Whelen George added to party Matthew Burkholder(pty:dft) (George, Matthew)
June 18, 2019 Filing 21 Defendant Sarah Meyer's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Jury Demand Attorney Margaret Neel Masters added to party Sarah Meyer(pty:dft) by Sarah Meyer.(Masters, Margaret)
June 18, 2019 Filing 20 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Walter Stricklin All parties do not consent.. (Aleinikoff, Brian)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Walter Stricklin. (Aleinikoff, Brian)
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy James Luetkemeyer on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Timothy James Luetkemeyer added to party Walter Stricklin(pty:pla) (Luetkemeyer, Timothy)
May 31, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Jury Demand Attorney Craig A. Sargent added to party John Williams, Jr(pty:dft) by John Williams, Jr.(Sargent, Craig)
May 29, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Sarah Meyer served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Braley, Bruce)
May 22, 2019 Filing 15 Matthew Buckholder, PA-C's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Jury Demand, and Certificate of Review Attorney Kari MacKercher Hershey added to party Matthew Burkholder(pty:dft) by Matthew Burkholder.(Hershey, Kari)
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 Defendants Mason, Carris & CHI d/b/a Penrose Hospital's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Margaret Neel Masters added to party Barbara Carris(pty:dft), Attorney Margaret Neel Masters added to party Catholic Health Initiatives Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Margaret Neel Masters added to party Nicole Mason(pty:dft) by Barbara Carris, Catholic Health Initiatives Colorado, Nicole Mason.(Masters, Margaret)
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant Brock Bordelon, MD's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Jury Demand Attorney Karin Bassa Williamson added to party Brock Bordelon(pty:dft) by Brock Bordelon.(Williamson, Karin)
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Matthew Burkholder served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. (Braley, Bruce)
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Brock Bordelon served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. (Braley, Bruce)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Barbara Carris served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. (Braley, Bruce)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. John Williams, Jr served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. (Braley, Bruce)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Nicole Mason served on 5/2/2019, answer due 5/23/2019. (Braley, Bruce)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Catholic Health Initiatives Colorado served on 5/2/2019, answer due 5/23/2019. (Braley, Bruce)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/24/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/01/2019. (ksena)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2018 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/ 30/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/30/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6658202)Attorney Brian Aleinikoff added to party Walter Stricklin(pty:pla), filed by Walter Stricklin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Aleinikoff, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stricklin v. Bordelon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock Bordelon
Represented By: Karin Bassa Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Williams, Jr
Represented By: Craig A. Sargent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Burkholder
Represented By: Matthew Whelen George
Represented By: Kari MacKercher Hershey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Meyer
Represented By: Margaret Neel Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Mason
Represented By: Margaret Neel Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Health Initiatives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Carris
Represented By: Margaret Neel Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Health Initiatives Colorado
Represented By: Margaret Neel Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Stricklin
Represented By: Brian Aleinikoff
Represented By: Timothy James Luetkemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?