Hall v. Lamond

Plaintiff: David Hall
Defendant: Roderick Lamond
Case Number: 1:2019cv01261
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/18/19. The Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice #8 is approved; plaintiff's claims against defendant in this action are dismissed with prejudice; the scheduling conference set before Magistrate Judge Varholak on July 1, 2019, is vacated; and this case is closed. (rebsec)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case with Prejudice by Plaintiff David Hall (Astuno, John)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF REVIEW AS TO RODERICK LAMOND, M.D. by Plaintiff David Hall. (Astuno, John)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/1/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/1/2019. (jgonz, )
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/1/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rvill, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #1 Complaint filed by attorney John J. Astuno, Jr. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF), and in the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a), 1.3(f) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Lamond Roderick (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6662320)Attorney John J. Astuno, Jr added to party John J. Astuno, Jr(pty:conpla), Attorney John J. Astuno, Jr added to party David Andrew Hall(pty:pla), filed by David Andrew Hall, John J. Astuno, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Astuno, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Lamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick Lamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hall
Represented By: John J. Astuno, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?