Alcorn v. LM Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Caleb A Alcorn
Defendant: LM Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01420
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 9/3/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 6/14/2019. (slibi, )
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding.By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/13/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant LM Insurance Corporation All parties do not consent.. (White, Holly)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard D. Daly on behalf of Caleb A AlcornAttorney Richard D. Daly added to party Caleb A Alcorn(pty:pla) (Daly, Richard)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 06/07/2019. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be desigated as 19-cv-01420-REB. (rvill, ) Modified to correct text on 6/7/2019 (rvill, ).
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian John Spano on behalf of LM Insurance CorporationAttorney Brian John Spano added to party LM Insurance Corporation(pty:dft) (Spano, Brian)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 7/1/2019. Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF #6 ) due by 7/1/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/24/19. Text Only Entry (amont, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Shawn Sar on behalf of Caleb A AlcornAttorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Caleb A Alcorn(pty:pla) (Sar, Jonathan)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Bradley Leventhal on behalf of Caleb A AlcornAttorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Caleb A Alcorn(pty:pla) (Leventhal, Sean)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon LM Insurance Corporation on 04/11/2019 (rroge, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rroge, ) Modified on 5/20/2019 (rroge, ) to correct docket.
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against LM Insurance Corporation, filed by Caleb A Alcorn.(rroge, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rroge, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Records by Defendant LM Insurance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(White, Holly)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LM Insurance Corporation from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2019cv30843. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6692609), filed by LM Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit C - State Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Amended State Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit E - Summons, #6 Exhibit F - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(White, Holly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alcorn v. LM Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Holly C. White
Represented By: Brian John Spano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb A Alcorn
Represented By: Richard D. Daly
Represented By: Jonathan Shawn Sar
Represented By: Sean Bradley Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?