In re: William Stuart Dennen
Interested Party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado and U.S. Trustee
Appellant: William S. Dennen
Case Number: 1:2019cv01428
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Establishing Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Requirements re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by William S. Dennen. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/01/2019. (athom, )
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Assigning Case to AP Docket, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/26/2019. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-1428-REB (angar, )
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/24/2019.(angar, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) by Appellant William S. Dennen. (angar, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL. Number of Volumes: 3. Appellant Brief due by 7/20/2019. Appellee Brief due by 8/19/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 9/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Volume I, #2 Volume II, #3 Volume III)(angar, ) Modified on 6/21/2019 to correct text (angar, ). Modified on 7/5/2019 to correct briefing deadlines (athom, ).
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal - Record on Appeal - "A Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election was filed on May 17, 2019, in the captioned case and assigned District Court case number 19-cv-1428 GPG. As of the date of this notice, no additional documents have been filed related to this appeal" (angar, )
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Appellant to Cure Deficiency. If Appellant fails to cure the designated deficiency within thirty days from the date of this order the notice of appeal and the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/20/2019. (angar, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 CASE OPENING. The above captioned case was opened on 05/20/2019 and assigned the case number referenced above. After docketing of the record on appeal from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, briefing will proceed in accordance with Bankruptcy Rules 8014, 8015, and 8018, and any orders of the court. When referencing trial exhibits you must attach copies to your brief. If the court finds it necessary to have the originals presented it will issue an order. All filings with the United States District Court, unless otherwise permitted by our Electronic Case Filing Procedures, must be done electronically. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Transmittal of Appeal Pursuant to Rule 8003(d)re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (rvill, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT by Appellant William S. Dennen in re: Order of May 14, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Docket Sheet U.S. Bankruptcy Court)(rvill, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: William Stuart Dennen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: William S. Dennen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?