Friends of Animals v. Bernhardt et al

Plaintiff: Friends of Animals
Defendant: David Bernhardt and U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Case Number: 1:2019cv01443
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 07/18/2019. (mdave, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: granting #14 Joint Motion for Order to Permit Parties to Submit Modified Scheduling Order; Scheduling Conference held on 7/18/2019. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Order to Permit Parties to Submit Modified Scheduling Order by Defendants David Bernhardt, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Dickey, Lauren)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #12 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/9/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
July 5, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants David Bernhardt, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service All parties consent.. (Dickey, Lauren)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Lauren Marie Dickey added to party David Bernhardt(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Marie Dickey added to party U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service(pty:dft) by David Bernhardt, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service.(Dickey, Lauren)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) David Bernhardt served on 5/28/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Harris, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service served on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Harris, Michael)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/23/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2019 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01443-MEH. (athom, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jessie K. Liu, William Barr, David Bernhardt, USFWS by Plaintiff Friends of Animals. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Harris, Michael)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Friends of Animals (Harris, Michael)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Bernhardt, United States Fish and Wildlife Service (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6697586)Attorney Michael Ray Harris added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals.(Harris, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of Animals v. Bernhardt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of Animals
Represented By: Michael Ray Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?