Diaz v. Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Peter T Diaz
Defendant: Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01452
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 18 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Riter, Tory)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #16 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/10/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company All parties consent.. (Riter, Tory)
June 7, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard D. Daly on behalf of Peter T DiazAttorney Richard D. Daly added to party Peter T Diaz(pty:pla) (Daly, Richard)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Riter, Tory)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent USAA Casulaty Insurance Company for Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Riter, Tory)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER re: #11 Response to Order to Show Cause, filed by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/28/2019. The Order to Show Cause is discharged. Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and Supplement to Notice of Removal [Document 1] re #8 by Defendant Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Amy T. Johnson added to party Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit M Driver Record, #2 Exhibit Exhibit N Vehicle Registration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit O Business Registration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit P, Insurance Renewal)(Johnson, Amy)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Shawn Sar on behalf of Peter T DiazAttorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Peter T Diaz(pty:pla) (Sar, Jonathan)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Bradley Leventhal on behalf of Peter T DiazAttorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Peter T Diaz(pty:pla) (Leventhal, Sean)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: returnable by Defendant why the Court should not remand this case (or recommend that it be remanded) for Defendant's failure to show complete diversity of citizenship pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332 by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/22/2019. Show Cause Response due by 5/29/2019. (mdave, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT ORDER re: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, signed by Arapahoe County District Court Judge Elizabeth Beebe Volz. (cmadr, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company on 4/24/2019 (cmadr, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Peter T Diaz.(cmadr, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company from District Court, Arapahoe County, Case Number 2019cv30951. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6700651), filed by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-Complaint, #4 Exhibit B-ROS, #5 Exhibit C-Summons, #6 Exhibit D-Civil Case Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit E-Voter Registration, #8 Exhibit F-Public Record, #9 Exhibit G-Secretary of State, #10 Exhibit H-Delay Reduction Order, #11 Exhibit I-Motion for EOT to Answer, #12 Exhibit J- Order for EOT to Answer, #13 Exhibit K-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #14 Exhibit L-State Docket)(Riter, Tory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz v. Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Tory Drew Riter
Represented By: Amy T. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter T Diaz
Represented By: Richard D. Daly
Represented By: Jonathan Shawn Sar
Represented By: Sean Bradley Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?