Sternal et al v. Sun Trust Mortgage, Inc.

Plaintiff: Lee N. Sternal and Maryann Sternal
Defendant: Sun Trust Mortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01454
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Daniel D Domenico
2 Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on July 16, 2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc2)
July 16, 2019 Filing 19 CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01454-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Sun Trust Mortgage, Inc.. (Peck, Jeremy)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER denying #13 Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default for failure to confer per D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(a). By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/20/2019. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #13 MOTION for Entry of Default as to filed by Defendant Sun Trust Mortgage, Inc.. (Peck, Jeremy)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting #14 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone at Scheduling and Planning Conference. Defense counsel shall contact chambers, 719-575-0328, at the scheduled time. Defense counsel shall use a LAND LINE; NO CELLULAR, CORDLESS OR SPEAKER PHONES ARE PERMITTED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/20/2019. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at Scheduling and Planning Conference by Defendant Sun Trust Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Peck, Jeremy)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Entry of Default as to by Plaintiffs Lee N. Sternal, Maryann Sternal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Sternal, Lee)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lee N. Sternal on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Lee N. Sternal added to party Lee N. Sternal(pty:pla), Attorney Lee N. Sternal added to party Maryann Sternal(pty:pla) (Sternal, Lee)
May 28, 2019 ***Set/Reset Deadlines: Consent Form due by 7/15/2019. (ksena)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/22/2019 10:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/28/2019. (ksena)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01454-KMT. (athom, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Sun Trust Banks, Inc. for Sun Trust Mortgage, Inc.. (Peck, Jeremy)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elizabeth Julianne Field on behalf of Sun Trust Mortgage, Inc.Attorney Elizabeth Julianne Field added to party Sun Trust Mortgage, Inc.(pty:dft) (Field, Elizabeth)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT UNDER SIMPLIFIED CIVIL PROCEDURE against Sun Trust Mortgage, Inc., filed by Lee N. Sternal and Maryann Sternal.(rvill, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sun Trust Mortgage, Inc.. Sun Trust Mortgage, Inc. waiver sent on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Peck, Jeremy)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sun Trust Mortgage, Inc. from District Court, Pueblo County, Case Number 2019CV30241. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6700731), filed by Sun Trust Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A (redacted), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Peck, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sternal et al v. Sun Trust Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Trust Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Julianne Field
Represented By: Jeremy David Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee N. Sternal
Represented By: Lee N. Sternal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryann Sternal
Represented By: Lee N. Sternal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?