Guanespen Polvon v. USA et al
Plaintiff: Ramona Guanespen Polvon
Defendant: Kristi Barrows, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States of America and USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01477
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jane Elizabeth Bobet on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Jane Elizabeth Bobet added to party Kristi Barrows(pty:dft), Attorney Jane Elizabeth Bobet added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Jane Elizabeth Bobet added to party USA(pty:dft) (Bobet, Jane)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy Bart Jafek on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Timothy Bart Jafek added to party Kristi Barrows(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Bart Jafek added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Bart Jafek added to party USA(pty:dft) (Jafek, Timothy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION to Withdraw Document re #10 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Ramona Guanespen Polvon. (Meade, Shawn)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to #11 Order Reassigning Case, #12 Memorandum Returning Case This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01477 RM. (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE for reassignment by Senior Judge David M. Ebel (evana, )
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE: ASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. IT IS ORDERED that under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a), all of the above-captioned cases shall be assigned by random draw to the same judge for resolution on the merits. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/06/2019. This case is reassigned to Judge David M. Ebel. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01477-DME. (athom, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Ramona Guanespen Polvon. (Meade, Shawn)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing Preparation of Joint Case Management Plan by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/28/2019. (cthom, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to United States of America by Plaintiff Ramona Guanespen Polvon. (Meade, Shawn)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services by Plaintiff Ramona Guanespen Polvon. (Meade, Shawn)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Kristi Barrows by Plaintiff Ramona Guanespen Polvon. (Meade, Shawn)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Plaintiff Ramona Guanespen Polvon (Meade, Shawn)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6705860)Attorney Shawn David Meade added to party Ramona Guanespen Polvon(pty:pla), filed by Ramona Guanespen Polvon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Meade, Shawn)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guanespen Polvon v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Barrows
Represented By: Timothy Bart Jafek
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Bobet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Timothy Bart Jafek
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Bobet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Timothy Bart Jafek
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Bobet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Guanespen Polvon
Represented By: Shawn David Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?