Colic v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Ruzica Colic
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht, Lee Francis Cissna, Kevin McAleenan, William Barr and Angela K. Goldinger
Case Number: 1:2019cv01511
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #8 and #11 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/17/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants William Barr, Lee Francis Cissna, Angela K. Goldinger, Andrew Lambrecht, Kevin McAleenan All parties consent.. (Dickey, Lauren)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Continue by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/11/2019. The Status Conference set for 7/29/2019 is VACATED and RESET for 8/13/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Furthermore, the court notes that Plaintiff submitted a Consent/Non-consent Form that is not signed by Defendants. To effectuate the Parties' consent or non-consent, Defendants must also file a signed Consent/Non-consent Form, and the deadline to do so remains 7/22/2019. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Plaintiff Ruzica Colic. (Smith, Jennifer)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Ruzica Colic All parties consent.. (Smith, Jennifer)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lauren Marie Dickey on behalf of William Barr, Lee Francis Cissna, Angela K. Goldinger, Andrew Lambrecht, Kevin McAleenanAttorney Lauren Marie Dickey added to party William Barr(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Marie Dickey added to party Lee Francis Cissna(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Marie Dickey added to party Angela K. Goldinger(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Marie Dickey added to party Andrew Lambrecht(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Marie Dickey added to party Kevin McAleenan(pty:dft) (Dickey, Lauren)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/13/2019. A Status Conference is set for 7/29/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall complete and file the Consent/Nonconsent Form by 7/22/2019. (bwilk, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer Marylee Smith on behalf of Ruzica ColicAttorney Jennifer Marylee Smith added to party Ruzica Colic(pty:pla) (Smith, Jennifer)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. Summons Issued and mailed to address provided on Envelope. (rroge, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Jennifer M. Smith attempted to enter her appearance in this case by affixing her " s/ " signature to the complaint. Counsel was administratively removed from the attorney roll on or about November 1, 2015, for failing to pay a fee assessed in 2013. She is therefore not eligible to practice before the court. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a)(5) her purported appearance will not be recognized. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment Under 8 USC 1447(B) and to Compel Agency Action Under 28 USC 706(1) against William Barr, Lee Francis Cissna, Angela K. Goldinger, Andrew Lambrecht, Kevin McAleenan Filing Fee: 400.00 Receipt Number: COX090449, filed by Ruzica Colic. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rroge, ) Modified on 5/28/2019 to add envelope (rroge, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colic v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Francis Cissna
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela K. Goldinger
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruzica Colic
Represented By: Jennifer Marylee Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?