Thomas v. El Paso County Criminal Justice Center et al
Plaintiff: Colvin Thomas
Defendant: Deputy Rogers and El Paso County Criminal Justice Center
Case Number: 1:2019cv01612
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 19 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #13 Amended Complaint filed by Colvin Thomas, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/18/2019. (sphil, )
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/18/2019. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01612-LTB-GPG. (sphil, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/16/2019. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01612-LTB (sphil, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/16/2019, re: #15 Request for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED without prejudice as premature.(sphil, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 Letter re: MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Colvin Thomas. (sphil, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Colvin Thomas. (sphil, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT against El Paso County Criminal Justice Center, Deputy Rogers, filed by Colvin Thomas.(sphil, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER/Request for Forms re: #10 Order, by Plaintiff Colvin Thomas. (sphil, )
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Complaint that complies with this Order within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/7/2019. (sphil, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER by Plaintiff Colvin Thomas. (cmadr, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Diana Kay May on behalf of El Paso County Criminal Justice Center, Deputy RogersAttorney Diana Kay May added to party Deputy Rogers(pty:dft) (May, Diana)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of State Docket Sheet by Defendants El Paso County Criminal Justice Center, Deputy Rogers (Ritchie, Mary)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mary Margaret Ritchie on behalf of El Paso County Criminal Justice Center, Deputy Rogers (Ritchie, Mary)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). Each of the state court documents shall be individual PDFs. See Appendix B Notice of Removal, in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX090577 (cmadr, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Deputy Rogers, El Paso County Criminal Justice Center from District Court, El Paso County, Colorado, Case Number 2019CV144. (Filing fee $ 400)., filed by Deputy Rogers, El Paso County Criminal Justice Center. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Complaint-Coversheet-Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Service, #4 Exhibit Exhbit C - State Notice to Parties of Removal)(Ritchie, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. El Paso County Criminal Justice Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Rogers
Represented By: Mary Margaret Ritchie
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso County Criminal Justice Center
Represented By: Mary Margaret Ritchie
Represented By: Diana Kay May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colvin Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?