Donahue v. Wasatch Property Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sara K Donahue
Defendant: Wasatch Property Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01645
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
2 Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12111
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Reassign Case to Magistrate Judge in Denver, Colorado by Plaintiff Sara K Donahue. (Lipman, Gretchen)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Attorney Jonathan Neal Eddy added to party Wasatch Property Management, Inc.(pty:dft) by Wasatch Property Management, Inc..(Eddy, Jonathan)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 This matter has its factual nexus in Eagle County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction. Accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 19-cv-01645-DDD-GPG. (dddint1, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (athom, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Wasatch Property Management, Inc. by Plaintiff Sara K Donahue. (Lipman, Gretchen)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on June 7, 2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc2)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rroge, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wasatch Property Management, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6730612)Attorney Gretchen Elizabeth Lipman added to party Sara K Donahue(pty:pla), filed by Sara K Donahue.(Lipman, Gretchen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donahue v. Wasatch Property Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wasatch Property Management, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney B. Kramer
Represented By: Jonathan Neal Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara K Donahue
Represented By: Gretchen Elizabeth Lipman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?