Mejia v. Griggs et al
Plaintiff: Johnny Mejia
Defendant: Gregory M Griggs, Geico Casualty Company, Andrus Transportation Services, Inc. and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01647
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lara Lahey Miller on behalf of Geico Casualty CompanyAttorney Lara Lahey Miller added to party Geico Casualty Company(pty:dft) (Miller, Lara)
June 27, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Andrus Transportation Services, Inc., Gregory M Griggs.(Witte, Christopher)
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jon F. Sands on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty CompanyAttorney Jon F. Sands added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft) (Sands, Jon)
June 12, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #4 Complaint Attorney Katherine Karamalegos Kust added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Kust, Katherine)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 8/29/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 8/22/2019. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #13 ) is due 8/22/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/12/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. For good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendants Andrus Transportation Services, Inc. and Gregory M Griggs' answers are due 6/28/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/11/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #4 Complaint by Defendants Andrus Transportation Services, Inc., Gregory M Griggs. (Witte, Christopher)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-1647-SKC (angar, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Theodore R. Ridder on behalf of Johnny MejiaAttorney Theodore R. Ridder added to party Johnny Mejia(pty:pla) (Ridder, Theodore)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Gregory M. Griggs on 5/30/2019. (cmadr, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant Geico Casualty Company's ANSWER and Jury Demand to #4 Complaint by Geico Casualty Company.(cmadr, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Corporate Service of Summons, Complaint upon Geico Casualty Company on May 3, 2019. (cmadr, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Andrus Transportation Services, Inc., Geico Casualty Company, Gregory M Griggs, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, filed by Johnny Mejia.(cmadr, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Heather A. Salg on behalf of Geico Casualty CompanyAttorney Heather A. Salg added to party Geico Casualty Company(pty:dft) (Salg, Heather)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Barker, Nathaniel)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Geico Casualty Company from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2019cv31730. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6730746), filed by Geico Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Barker, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mejia v. Griggs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Mejia
Represented By: Theodore R. Ridder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory M Griggs
Represented By: Christopher James Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Casualty Company
Represented By: Heather A. Salg
Represented By: Nathaniel Scott Barker
Represented By: Lara Lahey Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrus Transportation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher James Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Katherine Karamalegos Kust
Represented By: Jon F. Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?